This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 14:38:49 (UTC).

GEORGE TURUNEH YIGZAW, VS. ALBERTSON LUIS SALDANA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2012 GEORGE TURUNEH YIGZAW filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALBERTSON LUIS SALDANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and CARY NISHIMOTO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6894

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

CARY NISHIMOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YIGZAW GEORGE TURUNEH

Defendants

SALDANA ALBERTON LUIS

VANGUARD CAR RENTAL USA HOLDINGS INC.

SALDANA ALBERTO LUIS ESA ALBERTON LUIS

DOES 1 TO 60

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY (DOE 1)

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY DOE 1

SALDANA ALBERTO LUIS ESA N LUIS

Not Classified By Court

CHERMISQUI ROSANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

P. CHRISTOPHER ARDALAN

ARDALAN P. CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

POPOVICH JERRY C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/13/2012: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2012: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/23/2012: Legacy Document - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/4/2012: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

6/21/2012: Answer

Legacy Document - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/2/2012: Legacy Document - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Legacy Document - AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/5/2012: Legacy Document - AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Legacy Document - NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CIVIL

8/2/2012: Legacy Document - NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CIVIL

Case Management Statement

9/14/2012: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

9/20/2012: Minute Order

Legacy Document - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR

10/4/2012: Legacy Document - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR

Notice - NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING

11/26/2012: Notice - NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING

Legacy Document - NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING

12/18/2012: Legacy Document - NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/27/2013: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/3/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/10/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order -

7/11/2013: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

7/16/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION EACH PARTY BEAR OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GEORGE TURUNEH YIGZAW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Docketat 08:32 am in Department LA91, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Final Status Conference (ANDOSC RE FAILURE TO COMPLETE MED;7-11-13) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-07-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice, entire action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by GEORGE TURUNEH YIGZAW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GEORGE TURUNEH YIGZAW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less