This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 21:55:12 (UTC).

GEORGE S BOS VS AVAIL TRADING CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/07/2015 GEORGE S BOS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against AVAIL TRADING CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN, RICHARD E. RICO and WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8792

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

RICHARD E. RICO

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BOS GEORGE S

Defendants and Respondents

ATC BROKERS

AVAIL TRADING CORP.

DOES 1-20

MANOUKIAN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LENDRUM LAW FIRM APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WOLK SARAH R.

THOMAS PAUL W. ESQ.

ORDUBEGIAN ARAM ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/16/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/21/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS ETC.

2/13/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS ETC.

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/19/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

2/19/2015: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

5/1/2015: PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFENDANTS AVAIL TRADING CORP. AND DAVID MANOUKIAN'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/21/2015: DEFENDANTS AVAIL TRADING CORP. AND DAVID MANOUKIAN'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; (2) COMPARATIVE INDEMNITY; (3) CONTRIBUTION; AND (4) DECLARATORY RELIEF

6/16/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; (2) COMPARATIVE INDEMNITY; (3) CONTRIBUTION; AND (4) DECLARATORY RELIEF

DECLARATION OF JACKIE ABELLABA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

7/17/2015: DECLARATION OF JACKIE ABELLABA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order

9/17/2015: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/17/2015: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

10/1/2015: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Proof of Service

10/5/2015: Proof of Service

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' /CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2

10/5/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' /CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2

DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN OBJECTION TO THE PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION BY PLAINTIFF

12/18/2015: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN OBJECTION TO THE PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION BY PLAINTIFF

Minute Order

12/18/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

1/29/2016: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

4/11/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2016
  • JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by George S Bos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
189 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HFARJNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HFARJNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by George S Bos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by George S Bos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

01:50:06 p.m.08-31-2015 | 2 | 6506556633

From: Wolk & Levine, LLP VFax: (323) 892-2324 - To: ~ Fax: +1(213) 625-3244 Page 2 of 5 08/31/2015 1:58 PM

AUG 31 2015

Sherri R. Catter, Exegutive Officer/Clerk

By —TTE ST Deputy Attorneys for Defendants AVAIL TRADING CORP., - - Nancy Alvarez

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES -UNLIMITED

Case No.: BC568792 Assigned to: Hon. William F. Fahey, Dept: 69

Complaint Filed: 1/7/2015

" Trial Date: 11/09/15

DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE - ALTERNATIVE ' SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS"IT PERTAINS TO - THE CROSS-COMPLAINT (ISSUE #10 OR SECTION J ONLY)

Date: October 1, 2015 Time: 9:30 am. Dept.: 69

DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF THEIR MOTION FbR SUMMARY JUDGMENT