Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 03:21:09 (UTC).

GEORGE COOK VS ANSCHUTZ ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2015 GEORGE COOK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANSCHUTZ ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7933

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COOK GEORGE

Defendants and Respondents

AEG FACILITIES LLC

AEG LIVE LA LLC

AEG LIVE LLC

ANSCHUTZ ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

LA LIVE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC

LA LIVE ENTERTAINMENT INC.

LA LIVE PROPERTIES LLC

LA LIVE THEATRE LLC

ANSCHUTZ L.A. LAND CO. LLC - DOE 3

LA LIVE THEATRE INC. - DOE 5

AEG LIVE PRODUCTIONS LLC - DOE 4

ANSCHUTZ L.A. VENTURE INC. - DOE 2

LA LIVE CINEMAS LLC - DOE 6

ANSCHUTZ 12K COMPANY - DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BAER TREGER LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/7/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

4/7/2015: SUMMONS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/16/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/16/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/16/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/16/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/16/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/16/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/14/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/20/2015: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

8/24/2016: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

[ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91,92,93,97)

8/30/2016: [ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91,92,93,97)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF OTHER ORDER

9/2/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF OTHER ORDER

(PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

11/22/2016: (PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

Minute Order

3/15/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/15/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/3/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2015
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by George Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by George Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by George Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by George Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by George Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by George Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEG LIVE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LA LIVE THEATRE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AEG FACILITIES is a litigant

Latest cases where ANSCHUTZ ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION is a litigant