This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2016 at 06:47:16 (UTC).

GENTA REEP VS JON REEP

Case Summary

On 03/22/2013 GENTA REEP filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JON REEP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is IWASAKI, BRUCE G. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9596

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

IWASAKI, BRUCE G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REEP GENTA

Respondent

REEP JON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEEDS CRAIG BRIAN

Respondent Attorney

STRAUGH DEANNA K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2016
  • Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Notice-Appear & Resp-Emp Pen Ben P Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Request-Join Empl Ben Plan & Order Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Joinder/Employ Pension Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • Order-Qualified Dom. Relat (QDRO) ( MAILED CERTIFIED COPY IN PROVIDE D ENVELOPE ON 12/28/2015 ) Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • Notice-Withdrawal of Attorney Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • Decl-Deflt or Uncontested Jdgm Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2013
  • Request-Trial Setting Counter Long

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • Request-Trial Setting Long Cause

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Stipulation & Order Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Response Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Notice-Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRAUGH DEANNA K.