This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:03:00 (UTC).

GENE BROWN VS BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 GENE BROWN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MEL RED RECANA and TERRY A. GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0982

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEL RED RECANA

TERRY A. GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BROWN< GENE

BROWN GENE

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1_50

FANNON< ADAM

BEL_AIR COUNTRY CLUB

FANNON ADAM

BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

THE CULLEN LAW FIRM APC

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

ROMANELLO RACHEL L.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/9/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

5/24/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Minute Order

12/5/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

11/21/2016: Unknown

Unknown

11/21/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/20/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB AND ADAM FALLON'S NOTICE OF RULING ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/17/2016: DEFENDANTS BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB AND ADAM FALLON'S NOTICE OF RULING ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/11/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

10/6/2016: Minute Order

Proof of Service

10/5/2016: Proof of Service

ANSWER OF BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB AND ADAM FANNON TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/28/2016: ANSWER OF BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB AND ADAM FANNON TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6; DECLARATION OF KELSEY FISHER, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 170.6

9/28/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6; DECLARATION OF KELSEY FISHER, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 170.6

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/27/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/27/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/14/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

8/17/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PENALTIES: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION [GOV. CODE SEC. 12940, ET SEQ.]; ETC

8/17/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PENALTIES: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION [GOV. CODE SEC. 12940, ET SEQ.]; ETC

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gene Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Bel-Air Country Club (Defendant); Adam Fannon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bel-Air Country Club (Defendant); Adam Fannon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gene Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Gene Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gene Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PENALTIES: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION [GOV. CODE SEC. 12940, ET SEQ.]; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMANELLO RACHEL L.