This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 14:14:39 (UTC).

GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK VS. SYSTEM SOLDING (USA)

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SYSTEM SOLDING USA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8480

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GBC INTERNATION BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK

Defendants

3T HOLDING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHUNMING LI

DOES 1 THROUGH DOE 60 INCLUSIVE

SYSTEM SOLDING (USA) INC. A CALIFORNIA

SYSTEM SOLDING USA INC. A CALIFORNIA

LI CHUNMING

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIO COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EPPORT & RICHMAN LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by CHUNMING LI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Bankruptcy; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment (total of 8 Abstracts ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by GBC INTERNATION BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT**COURT DARK ON 4/21/17. CASE RESET TO 4/24/17 AT 8:30 AM**) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Court Order - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by GBC INTERNATION BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • ExParte Application; Filed by GBC INTERNATION BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by GBC INTERNATION BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by GBC INTERNATION BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by GBC INTERNATION BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by GBC INTERNATION BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Declaration (OF CHRISTPHER R. NELSON IN SUPPORT OF GBC INTERNATIONAL BANKS EX PARTE APPLICATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GBC International Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where 3T HOLDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SYSTEM SOLDING USA INC. is a litigant