This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2021 at 06:28:21 (UTC).

GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK VS. CHWC, INC., JOHN R. NUCCIO

Case Summary

On 11/09/2010 GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHWC, INC , JOHN R NUCCIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are C. EDWARD SIMPSON and JAN A. PLUIM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6318

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

JAN A. PLUIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Assignees

GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK

THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC.

Defendants

CHWC INC.

NUCCIO PAMELA S.

JP-JAN CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

NUCCIO JOHN R.

GOE & FORSYTHE LLP

Other

BOYLE EMILY R.

Not Classified By Court

ZELIN M. JASON ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLIFFORD P. JUNG ESQ.

GAREN CLARK

GAREN CLARK LAW OFFICES OF

JUNG & YUEN LLP

LAWRENCE & LAWRENCE A LAW CORP.

LAWRENCE GREG

STAPLETON CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorneys

GOE & FORSYTHE LLP

GOE ROBERT P.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2010: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/9/2010: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2010: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/9/2010: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/16/2010: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

11/16/2010: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

11/16/2010: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

11/16/2010: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/16/2010: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

11/16/2010: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/16/2010: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

11/16/2010: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/16/2010: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

11/16/2010: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Answer

1/11/2011: Answer

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT ENTERED

1/18/2011: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT ENTERED

Case Management Statement

3/22/2011: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/23/2011: Case Management Statement

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • Hearing01/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Hearing01/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketWrit-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketWrit-Other (RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WITH UNCOLLECTED COSTS OF $120.00 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (MEMORANDUM OF COSTS $198.69; DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST $132,380.23 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GBC INTERNATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.H.W.C. INC A CORPORATION DBA CRAZY HORSE is a litigant

Latest cases where GBC International Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLIFFORD P. JUNG & ASSOCIATES - CLIFFORD P. JUNG ESQ