This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 00:10:09 (UTC).

GARY PAUL O'CONNOR VS BOOSTZ INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/01/2016 GARY PAUL O'CONNOR filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BOOSTZ INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH R. KALIN, MICHAEL L. STERN, ROBERT S. DRAPER, GAIL FEUER and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9121

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH R. KALIN

MICHAEL L. STERN

ROBERT S. DRAPER

GAIL FEUER

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

O'CONNOR GARY PAUL

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 500

BAYPOINT MORTGAGE INC.

HASBUN SALEH A.

BOOSTZ INC.

KAPLAN MICHAEL R.

SISTERS IN LAW LLC

MICHAEL R. KAPLAN REVOCABLE INTERVIVOS

DR. ROOTS HERBS LLC

HASBUN AMBER

CURTIS GRETA SEDEAL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CURTIS GRETA SEDEAL

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Respondents

WESTAR FINANCIAL GROUP INC. (STRICKEN)

WESTAR LOAN SERVICING (STRICKEN)

BAYPOINT MORTGAGE INC.

HASBUN SALEH A.

VALLEY TRUST DEED SERVICES INC. (STRICKEN

BOOSTZ INC.

SALEH HASBUN (STRICKEN)

HASBUN AMBER

PRIVATE MONEY LENCERS INC. (STRICKEN)

HASBUN SALEH (STRICKEN)

HASBUN MELISSA (STRICKEN)

HASBUN CHARLES

W/O SALEH HASBUN STRICKEN

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ANTHONY C. DUFFY INC.

PICKER TODD A. ESQ.

PICKER TODD A.

HOGUE THOMAS D.

ULWELLING JAMES KASPER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SMYTH ANDREW E. ESQ.

BROWN ROBERT A. ESQ.

CLOUGH LARRY HAAKON ESQ.

HOGUE DAN

BROWN ROBERT ANTHONY ESQ.

CLOUGH LARRY H.

SMYTH ANDREW E.

BROWN ROBERT ANTHONY

IBISI ERIC

BARRIAGE JOHN BECKERICH

BROWN ROBERT A.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BROWN ROBERT ANTHONY

BROWN ROBERT A.

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF GARY PAUL O'CONNOR'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GRETA SEDEAL CURTIS'X PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; LAUREN E. SAINT DECLARATION OF

5/6/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF GARY PAUL O'CONNOR'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GRETA SEDEAL CURTIS'X PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; LAUREN E. SAINT DECLARATION OF

Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF TRIAL BRIEF/STATEMENT OF ISSUES OF PLAINTIFF GARY PAUL O'ONNOR, TRUSTEE OF THK MONEY MARKET RETIREMENT TRUST

3/30/2021: Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF TRIAL BRIEF/STATEMENT OF ISSUES OF PLAINTIFF GARY PAUL O'ONNOR, TRUSTEE OF THK MONEY MARKET RETIREMENT TRUST

Witness List

3/22/2021: Witness List

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER : STATUS HEARING; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

4/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER : STATUS HEARING; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/8/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF APPEAL

10/24/2016: NOTICE OF APPEAL

GENERAL DENIAL

5/3/2017: GENERAL DENIAL

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF GARY PAUL O'CONNOR'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GRETA S. CURTIS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

5/3/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF GARY PAUL O'CONNOR'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GRETA S. CURTIS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

GENERAL DENIAL -

5/25/2017: GENERAL DENIAL -

Minute Order -

5/30/2017: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

6/27/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

8/1/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

DEFENDANT GRETA SEDEAL CURTIS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/28/2017: DEFENDANT GRETA SEDEAL CURTIS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

RULING RE: (1) CROSS-DEFENDANTS BOOSTZ, INC., SALEH HASBUN, BAYPOINT MORTGAGE, INC., WESTAR FINANCIAL GOURP, INC., VALLEY TRUST DEED SERVICES, INC., AMBER HASBUN, AND MELISSA HASBUN'S MOTION TO STRIKE

9/27/2017: RULING RE: (1) CROSS-DEFENDANTS BOOSTZ, INC., SALEH HASBUN, BAYPOINT MORTGAGE, INC., WESTAR FINANCIAL GOURP, INC., VALLEY TRUST DEED SERVICES, INC., AMBER HASBUN, AND MELISSA HASBUN'S MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order -

4/2/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

8/31/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

PLAINITFF GARY PAUL O'CONNOR'S MOTION TO IN LIMINE NO. 1 FOR AN ORDER EXCLUDING EVIDENCE OF FIDUCIARY DUTY OWED BY PLAINTIFF TO GRETA CURTIS; ETC

8/31/2018: PLAINITFF GARY PAUL O'CONNOR'S MOTION TO IN LIMINE NO. 1 FOR AN ORDER EXCLUDING EVIDENCE OF FIDUCIARY DUTY OWED BY PLAINTIFF TO GRETA CURTIS; ETC

289 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 78; Non-Jury Trial (Re Partition Action, 2 day estimate,) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial Re Partition Action, 2 day estimate,)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 78; Non-Jury Trial (Re Partition Action, 2 day estimate,) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (of Defendant Curtis' Request for an Order to Continue Trial Date due to Her Continued Incapacity, Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Greta Curtis in Support Thereof) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant Curtis' Request ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Non-Jury Trial (Re Partition Action, 2 day estimate,) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (of Defendant Curtis' Request for an Order to Continue Trial Date due to Her Continued Incapacity, Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Greta Curtis in Support Thereof) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant Curtis' Request ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
580 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERRATA AND SUBSTITUTION OF CORRECT EXHIBIT B TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketVERIFICATION TO COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Gary Paul O'Connor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gary Paul O'Connor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC629121    Hearing Date: March 22, 2021    Dept: 78

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 78

gary paul o’connor;

Plaintiff,

vs.

BOOSTZ, INC., et al.;

Defendants.

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTION

Case No.:

BC629121

Hearing Date:

March 22, 2021

[TENTATIVE] RULING RE:

Defendant Boostz, INc.’s DEMURRER TO the SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Defendant Boostz, Inc.’s Demurrer to the Second Amended Complaint is OVERRULED.

Factual Background

This action involves the sale of real property. Plaintiff Gary O’Connor (“O’Connor”) alleges that he is the trustee of a trust that is the owner of a 90.05 percent share in two parcels of real property in Los Angeles, the “Compton Property” and the “East 1st Property.” (First Amended Complaint (“FAC”) ¶ 1.) The Complaint alleges generally that O’Connor entered into a Purchase Agreement (“Purchase Agreement”) with the owners of the remaining 9.95 percent interest in both properties in September 2014: Greta Curtis (“Curtis”), Baypoint Mortgage, Inc. (“Baypoint”), Boostz, Inc. (“Boostz”), and Dr. Roots Herbs, LLC (“Roots”) (SAC ¶ 5), and later entered into various Amendments, none of which were executed, through the fault of defendants. (SAC ¶¶ 2–4.) Curtis’ corporate alter egos include Defendants Baypoint, Boostz, Roots, as well as Sisters, LLC. (SAC ¶ 34.)

Curtis filed a Cross-Complaint on May 25, 2017, and an amended cross-complaint (“FAXC”) on July 26, 2017, alleging that O’Connor breached his fiduciary duty to her by filing the instant lawsuit to enforce an allegedly void sales agreement, and by failing to account for or distribute rent to his co-tenants in the relevant property, including Curtis. (FAXC ¶¶ 42–50.)

procedural history

O’Connor filed his Complaint on August 1, 2016, alleging six causes of action:

  1. Breach of Contract

  2. Fraud

  3. Specific Performance

  4. Quiet title

  5. Declaratory Relief

  6. Injunctions

On May 25, 2017, Curtis filed a Cross Complaint (“XC”).

On June 9, 2017, this case was reassigned to this department.

On July 26, 2017, Curtis filed an Amended Cross-Complaint (“FAXC”) naming as cross-defendants O’Connor, Boostz, Hasbun, Baypoint Mortgage, Inc. (“Baypoint”), Valley Trust Deed Services, Inc., Amber Hasbun, Melissa Hasbun, Ammec, Inc., Westar Loan Servicing, Inc. Westar Financial Group, Inc., asserting claims for:

  1. Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage (Against Baypoint, Boost and Hasbun)

  2. Rescission of Escrow Agreement Pursuant to Revenue and Taxation Code §23304.1, 23304.5 (Against Baypoint)

  3. Breach of Fiduciary Duty (Against Hasbun)

  4. Breach of Fiduciary Duty (Against Baypoint)

  5. Breach of Fiduciary Duty (Against O’Connor)

  6. Breach of Fiduciary Duty (Against Boostz)

  7. Quantum Meruit (Against All Cross-Defendants Except O’Connor)

  8. Unfair Business Practices (B&P Sec. 17200) (Against O’Connor)

  9. Accounting (Against O’Connor)

  10. Indemnification (Against All Cross-Defendants)

  11. Comparative Indemnity (Against All Cross-Defendants)

  12. Declaratory Relief (Against All Cross-Defendants)

  13. Equitable Indemnity (Against All Cross-Defendants)

  14. Contribution (Against All Cross-Defendants)

On September 6, 2017, this Court granted Curtis’ Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings with leave to amend as to the Fourth, Fifth, and Sixth Causes of Action, denied the motion as moot as to the First and Third Causes of Action, and denied the motion as to the second cause of action.

On September 18, 2017, O’Connor filed his First Amended Complaint alleging six causes of action:

  1. Breach of Contract;

  2. Fraud and Deceit;

  3. Specific Performance;

  4. Quiet Title;

  5. Declaratory Relief;

  6. Injunctions

This Court on September 27, 2017, granted Cross-Defendants Boostz, Inc., Saleh Hasbun, Baypoint Mortgage, Inc., Westar Financial Group, Inc., Valley Trust Deed Services, Inc., and Melissa Hasbun’s Motion to Strike Curtis’s FAXC. The court, however, limited its ruling to striking the portions of the FAXC not related to O’Connor.

Curtis on October 19, 2017, filed eight Roe amendments adding the cross-defendants that this Court had ordered stricken from the FAXC.

This Court on November 17, 2017, overruled O’Connor’s Demurrer to the FAXC. This Court also sua sponte ordered Curtis’s October 19, 2017 amendments stricken.

This Court on October 2, 2018, granted O’Connor’s Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (“SAC”). The SAC alleges seven causes of action:

  1. Breach of Contract

  2. Fraud and Deceit

  3. Specific Performance

  4. Quiet Title

  5. Declaratory Relief

  6. Injunctions

  7. Partition

Curtis on January 2, 2018, filed a Notice of Appeal of this Court’s September 27, 2017 order striking certain defendants from Curtis’s FAXC.

On April 9, 2019, a Remittitur was issued denying Curtis’s appeal on the grounds that she had impermissibly appealed from an interlocutory order.

On June 18, 2019, this Court denied Curtis’ filed Motion for Leave to Add Nine Cross-Defendants.

On September 10, 2019, this Court overruled the Demurrer filed by Defendants Curtis and Roots, and denied the Motion to Strike.

On September 18, 2020, Defendant Boostz filed the instant Demurrer.

On February 10, 2021, this Court overruled Baypoint’s Demurrer to the SAC as to the Fourth Cause of Action, and sustained with leave to amend as to the First – Third, and Fifth – Seventh Causes of Action.

No Opposition has been filed to the instant demurrer.

Discussion

  1. REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

Judicial notice may be taken of “(c) Official acts of the legislative, executive, and judicial departments of the United States and of any state of the United States. (d) Records of (1) any court of this state or (2) any court of record of the United States or of any state of the United States […] (h) Facts and propositions that are not reasonably subject to dispute and are capable of immediate and accurate determination by resort to sources of reasonably indisputable accuracy.” (Evid. Code § 452.)

Boostz does not submit a separate “Request for Judicial Notice,” but submits two documents with the “Declaration of Robert A. Brown:” (a) a “Certificate of Amendment of Articles of Incorporation” filed with the California Secretary of State on May 19, 2016; and (b) a “Certificate of Dissolution” filed with the California Secretary of State on November 8, 2017. The Court GRANTS these requests.

  1. DEMURRER

A demurrer should be sustained only where the defects appear on the face of the pleading or are judicially noticed. (Code Civ. Pro., §§ 430.30, et seq.) In particular, as is relevant here, a court should sustain a demurrer if a complaint does not allege facts that are legally sufficient to constitute a cause of action. (See id. § 430.10, subd. (e).) As the Supreme Court held in Blank v. Kirwan (1985) Cal.3d 311: “We treat the demurrer as admitting all material facts properly pleaded, but not contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law. . . . Further, we give the complaint a reasonable interpretation, reading it as a whole and its parts in their context.” (Id. at p. 318; see also Hahn. v. Mirda (2007) 147 Cal.App.4th 740, 747 [“A demurrer tests the pleadings alone and not the evidence or other extrinsic matters. Therefore, it lies only where the defects appear on the face of the pleading or are judicially noticed. [Citation.]”)

“In determining whether the complaint is sufficient as against the demurrer … if on consideration of all the facts stated it appears the plaintiff is entitled to any relief at the hands of the court against the defendants the complaint will be held good although the facts may not be clearly stated.” (Gressley v. Williams (1961) 193 Cal.App.2d 636, 639.)

  1. All Causes of Action

    Boostz argues that Plaintiff failed to bring two indispensable parties – Michael Kaplan, Trustee (“Kaplan”), and First Regional Bank (“FR Bank”) – which it contends “deprives the court of jurisdiction” and this Court “is required to order plaintiff to file proof of service of Kaplan” and to amend the SAC to include FR Bank as a defendant. (Motion at pp. 4-9.)

    “[T]he failure to join an ‘indispensable’ party is not ‘a jurisdictional defect’ in the fundamental sense; even in the absence of an ‘indispensable’ party, the court still has the power to render a decision as to the parties before it which will stand.” (Kraus v. Willow Park Public Golf Course (1977) 73 Cal.App.3d 354, 364.) Instead, “It is for reasons of equity and convenience, and not because it is without the power to proceed, that the court should not proceed with a case where it determines that an ‘indispensable party’ is absent and cannot be joined.” (Id.)

    Boostz’ demurrer is nearly entirely boilerplate, with little argument or evidence. Based on the judicially noticeable evidence provided, Boostz has not established for purposes of demurrer that Kaplan and FR Bank are indispensable parties. Further, the SAC lists Kaplan as a Defendant. The August 30, 2016 dismissal only dismissed Kaplan as to the First, Second, Third, and Fifth Causes of Action. The SAC makes numerous allegations against Kaplan.

    Lastly, Boostz has failed to establish why FR Bank must be joined “for reasons of equity and convenience.” The SAC does not make any allegations or references to FR Bank. Boostz does not argue with judicially noticeable evidence that any specific allegations against Boostz in the SAC should be alleged against FR Bank instead.

    Accordingly, Boostz, Inc.’s Demurrer to the SAC is OVERRULED.

DATED: March 22, 2021

________________________________

Hon. Robert S. Draper

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTAR FINANCIAL GROUP INC. (STRICKEN) is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLEY TRUST DEED SERVICES INC. (STRICKEN is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. ROOTS HERBS LLC is a litigant