This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2016 at 02:55:50 (UTC).

GARY KAWATE VS WALNUT HILLS PLAZA, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/18/2009 GARY KAWATE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALNUT HILLS PLAZA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MINTO, R. BRUCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6058

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MINTO, R. BRUCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAWATE GARY

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

TACO BELL

SERVICE SCAPES

ZBINDEN RANDY

COOK BETTY

JRC CONSTRUCTION & MANAGMENT

YUM

BRANDS INC

9429 WALNUT CAKE LLC

TOTAL MAINTENANCE COMPANY

TACO BELL CORP

PASSCO WLNUT HILLS PLAZA INC

WALNUT HILLS PLAZA LLC.

TACO BELL #3486

WALNUT CITY OF

PASSCO WALNUT HILLS PLAZA LLC

RETAIL NET LEASE PROPERTIES INC.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SERVICE SCAPES

COOK MARK

ZBINDEN RANDY

JRC CONSTRUCTION & MANAGMENT

YUM

BRANDS INC

9429 WALNUT CAKE LLC

TOTAL MAINTENANCE COMPANY

THE COOK PARTNERSHIP

TACO BELL CORP

WALNUT HILLS PLAZA LLC.

TACO BELL #3486

JAMES R. CHIAMULON DBA JRC CONSTRUCTION &

RETAIL NET LEASE PROPERTIES INC.

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERN GARY N.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

COX SCOTT A. ESQ.

GROSSBERG SCOTT J.

MCCARTHY JOHN B. JR.

BEHAR JEFFREY S. ESQ.

HENGESBACH DAREN E. ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (with prejudice cross-complaint filed by JRC Construction, Inc.; 9429 Walnut Cake on 01-27-10 ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal (with prejudice; entire action of all parties and all causes of action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (Cross-complaint by Randy Zbinden dba Service Scape w/prejudice ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (CROSS-COMPLAINT BY TOTAL MAINTENANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • DocketNotice (of Settlement ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (CROSS-COMP BY JRC CONSTRUCTION; 9429 WALNUT CAKE ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (Cross-Comp by Total Maintenance Co ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (Cross-complaint filed by Betty Cook dba Taco Bell w/Prejudice ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2009
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Amended Doe 1 Passco Walnut Hills Plaza, LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketMotion to Strike Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 1 Passco Wlnut Hills Plaza, Inc ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl ((2x) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • DocketProof of Service Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • DocketProof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yum's, Inc. d/b/a/ Yum's Subs is a litigant

Latest cases where WALNUT CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where Limited Brands, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where 9429 WALNUT CAKE LLC is a litigant