Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 12:10:00 (UTC).

GARGIULO, HENRY A. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/24/2016 GARGIULO, HENRY A - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, BARBARA R. and STRATTON, MARIA E.. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2216

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

STRATTON, MARIA E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRUE ALAN

Not Classified By Court

BETHEL STEPHEN

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

BETHEL STEPHEN K.

Decedent

GARGIULO HENRY A.

Interested Parties

BRUE STEPHANIE

REMOVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LABARBERA DEANA ANN

Interested Party Attorneys

SCHROEDER STEVEN DALE

PFAU MATTHEW G

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate (for deaths after 10/31/1984)

3/24/2016: Petition for Probate (for deaths after 10/31/1984)

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

4/8/2016: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication

4/19/2016: Proof of Publication

Supplement - Petition for Probate Pursuant Probate Notes

5/3/2016: Supplement - Petition for Probate Pursuant Probate Notes

Will - Admitted

5/12/2016: Will - Admitted

Order - Appointing Personal Representative - With Full Authority

6/1/2016: Order - Appointing Personal Representative - With Full Authority

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

6/13/2016: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

6/16/2016: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Assignment - Stephanie Bure's Assignment #1, Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest etc..

6/20/2016: Assignment - Stephanie Bure's Assignment #1, Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest etc..

Request - Special Notice

6/21/2016: Request - Special Notice

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

1/19/2017: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Ex Parte - Petition - A verified first interim accounting

2/8/2017: Ex Parte - Petition - A verified first interim accounting

Account - Final or Waiver - First & Final Account and Report; Petition for Statutory Fees; etc

3/14/2017: Account - Final or Waiver - First & Final Account and Report; Petition for Statutory Fees; etc

Notice - Hearing

3/20/2017: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

5/24/2017: Minute Order

Order - Settling First and Final Account

6/8/2017: Order - Settling First and Final Account

Minute Order

12/7/2017: Minute Order

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

12/28/2017: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketReceipt (Receipts on Distribution ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 57, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketNotice - Order of Case Reassignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketOrder (Settling First and Final Account )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketAccount - Final or Waiver (First & Final Account and Report; Petition for Statutory Fees; etc ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative (With Full Authority ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketSupplement (Petition for Probate Pursuant Probate Notes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Publication (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed By: Brue, Alan, Petitioner Repres By: LaBarbera, Deana A., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (1st Hearing Date: 05/12/2016 Filed By: Brue, Alan, Petitioner Repres By: LaBarbera, Deana A., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PFAU MATTHEW G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHROEDER STEVEN DALE