Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:23:15 (UTC).

GARFIELD-PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT COMPANY VS. SHAWN GREENE

Case Summary

On 11/03/2015 GARFIELD-PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT COMPANY filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SHAWN GREENE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8298

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARFIELD-PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

SHAWN GREENE

GREENE'S HANDY MAN SERVICE

GREENE SHAWN

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD L. SEIDE A.P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by GARFIELD-PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Notice (REJECTION; #1 BOX NEED TO BE CHECKED, #1A DEBTOR'S NAME MUST MATCHED EXACTLY AS IT IS ON PAGE 2 OF THE JUDGMENT. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TOPROSECUTE OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Default Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Notice of Continuance (COURT DARK 6/2/16 CONT TO 6/13/16 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by GARFIELD-PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Default Entered (AS TO SHAWN GREENE, AN INDIVIDUAL DOING BUSINESS AS GREENE'S HANDYMAN SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by GARFIELD-PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by GARFIELD-PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARFIELD PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT COMPANY is a litigant