Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 15:42:29 (UTC).

GARFIELD-PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT CO. VS. COAST TO COAST FABRICS

Case Summary

On 02/21/2013 GARFIELD-PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT CO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COAST TO COAST FABRICS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7247

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARFIELD-PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT CO.

Defendants

COAST TO COAST FABRICS INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOWER & ASSOCIATES APLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Judgment Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Default Entered Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (application for entry of default judgment & declarationg of Jennifer Reed in support thereof ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (without prejudice as to does ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • Default Entered Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARFIELD PACIFIC DEVELOPMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT is a litigant