This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2019 at 21:42:38 (UTC).

GAMIL YOUSSEF VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SOC

Case Summary

On 08/06/2010 GAMIL YOUSSEF filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SOC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHANIE M. BOWICK, ADR NEUTRAL, MATTHEW ST. GEORGE, RONALD M. SOHIGIAN, RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and RICHARD FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3263

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

ADR NEUTRAL

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

RICHARD FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAMIL YOUSSEF

YOUSSEF GAMIL

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SOCIAL SERVICES

Other

HIRSCHMAN ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AKUDINOBI EMMANUEL C. ESQ.

REINACH ALAN J.

BAKER ROBERT CRAIG

LOWE DERRICK SEAN

Defendant Attorneys

MURPHY ROBERT E. ESQ.

TRAVIS ANDREA M. ESQ.

MURPHY ROBERT EUGENE ESQ.

SAMUELIAN MINAS

MURPHY ROBERT E.

 

Court Documents

Motion for New Trial

8/14/2019: Motion for New Trial

Substitution of Attorney

8/20/2019: Substitution of Attorney

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

7/25/2011: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

8/24/2011: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY?CIVIL (WITHOUT COURT ORDER)

12/30/2011: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY?CIVIL (WITHOUT COURT ORDER)

DECLARATION OF GAMIL YOUSSEF? IN OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO QUASH NOTICE TO APPEAR IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA AND/OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: ALISA BELINKOFF KASS, ROXANE MARQUEZ, LOUISA OLLAGUE

6/9/2014: DECLARATION OF GAMIL YOUSSEF? IN OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO QUASH NOTICE TO APPEAR IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA AND/OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: ALISA BELINKOFF KASS, ROXANE MARQUEZ, LOUISA OLLAGUE

Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS JOINT LIST OF CACI JURY INSTRUCTION LIST

4/16/2019: Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS JOINT LIST OF CACI JURY INSTRUCTION LIST

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/23/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/26/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER; DECLARATION OF ROBERT E. MURPHY; EXHIBITS

2/22/2018: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER; DECLARATION OF ROBERT E. MURPHY; EXHIBITS

Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

1/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM THE THE TRUTHFULNESS OF FACTS ADMITTED

1/26/2012: AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM THE THE TRUTHFULNESS OF FACTS ADMITTED

NOTICE TO APPEAR IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA

5/20/2014: NOTICE TO APPEAR IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA

Minute Order -

5/29/2014: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. FIVE, FOR AN ORDER TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF OR HIS WITNESSES FROM REFERENCING OR INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED INJURIES AND/OR DAMAGES CLAIMED IN HIS PRIOR

8/25/2015: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. FIVE, FOR AN ORDER TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF OR HIS WITNESSES FROM REFERENCING OR INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED INJURIES AND/OR DAMAGES CLAIMED IN HIS PRIOR

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

9/8/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12, FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM REFERENCING TO OR INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OF EVENTS TAKING PLACE PRIOR TO THE COMPLETION OF SETTLEMENT IN FEBRUARY 2007; ETC.

10/13/2016: DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12, FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM REFERENCING TO OR INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OF EVENTS TAKING PLACE PRIOR TO THE COMPLETION OF SETTLEMENT IN FEBRUARY 2007; ETC.

Minute Order -

6/19/2017: Minute Order -

400 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • Hearing02/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike the Defendants' Entire Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For an Order to Correct Plaintiff's Motion Hearing on November 25, 2019 Form "Motion For Attonrey's Fees" to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Defendants' Entire Memorandum of Costs", And Request for Continuance) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for an Order to Correct Plaintiff's Motion Hearing on November 25th, 2019 form "Motion for Attorney's Fees" to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Entire Memorandum of Costs"); Filed by Gamil Youssef (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order to Correct Plain...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order to Correct Plain...) of 11/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketOrder (To Correct Plaintiff's Motion Hearing on November 25th, 2019 form Motion for Attorney's Fees to Plaintiff's Motin to Strike the Defendant's Entire Memorandum of Costs, And Request for Continuance)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketOpposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DEFENDANTS' ENTIRE MEMORANDUM OF COSTS, AND A WARD PLAINTIFF'S COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES BASED ON THE TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ON AUGUST 10, 2006 AFTER THE DEFENDANTS ADMITTED BREACHING THE SETTLEMENT A); Filed by County of Los Angeles Erroneously Sued As Los Angeles County Department of Public Social Services (Defendant); County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading) (the Defendants' Entire Memorandum of Costs, And Award Plaintiff's Costs and Attorneys' Fees Based on The Terms of Settlement Agreement on August 10, 2006 After the Defendants Admitted Breaching the Settlement Agreement Contract); Filed by Gamil Youssef (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice ( OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER); Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
833 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2010-08-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR ECONOMIC, COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF JURY TRIAL DEMANDED (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gamil Youssef (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2002
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC443263    Hearing Date: February 19, 2020    Dept: 19

On the Court's own Motion, the following motions are CONTINUED TO February 27, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.:

1. Plaintiff Gamil Youssef's Motion For Attorney's Fees and Costs, and Motion to Strike, currently set for 2/19/20 and 2/26/20.

2. Defendant County of Los Angeles' Motion for Attorney's Fees, currently set for 2/19/20.

These motions shall be heard with the Motion for Attorney's Fees filed by Attorney Emmanuel C. Akudinobi, on calendar for 2/27/2020, at 8:30 a.m.

In the interest of judicial economy and efficiency, the motion hearing dates are being combined to one hearing date. In addition, the Court is still waiting for all filed briefing to be scanned into the Court's E-Filing system.

Clerk to give notice.