This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 02:30:30 (UTC).

GABRIELA CONTRERAS, ET AL VS. JIMMY WILLIAMS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/06/2012 GABRIELA CONTRERAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JIMMY WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CARY NISHIMOTO, DUDLEY W. GRAY II and REFERENCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7750

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CARY NISHIMOTO

DUDLEY W. GRAY II

REFERENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CONTRERAS GABRIELA

NOLASCO JIMMY

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

WILLIAMS JIMMY

Not Classified By Court

CRAWFORD FRED D. ESQ.

Minor

CONTRERAS NATHAN NOLASCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STOLL MATTHEW C.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CLASEN RAFFALOW & RHOADS

Cross Defendant Attorney

CHRISTENSEN F. LEE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/6/2012: Notice of Case Management Conference

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (EX-PARTE)

9/6/2012: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (EX-PARTE)

Summons

9/6/2012: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/6/2012: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-RE OTHER (MISCELLANEOUS)

9/7/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-RE OTHER (MISCELLANEOUS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-09-14 00:00:00

9/14/2012: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-09-14 00:00:00

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/20/2012: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Cross-Complaint

12/17/2012: Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial - CROSS-COMPLAINT'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/17/2012: Demand for Jury Trial - CROSS-COMPLAINT'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Other - - CIVIL DEPOSIT (JURY FEES)

12/17/2012: Other - - CIVIL DEPOSIT (JURY FEES)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/18/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/15/2013: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Other - - CIVIL DEPOSIT (JURY FEES)

2/21/2013: Other - - CIVIL DEPOSIT (JURY FEES)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

2/25/2013: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE-ASSIGNMENT-MEDIATOR

3/7/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE-ASSIGNMENT-MEDIATOR

Notice - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING (MEDIATION)

3/18/2013: Notice - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING (MEDIATION)

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/15/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

6/17/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Not Held-Removed ADR-Other) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Docketin Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding; Closed-ADR (4-25-13CRAWFORD, FRED D. IV-MEDIATOR) - Not Held-Removed ADR-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (FIRST STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NON-AGREEMENT FILED. MEDIATION WAS SCHEDULED BUT NOT HELD. ); Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DocketNotice-Mediation Hrg Date; Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by NATHAN NOLASCO CONTRERAS (Legacy Party); GABRIELA CONTRERAS (Legacy Party); JIMMY NOLASCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Ex-Parte); Filed by GABRIELA CONTRERAS (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JIMMY NOLASCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JIMMY NOLASCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by NATHAN NOLASCO CONTRERAS (Legacy Party); GABRIELA CONTRERAS (Legacy Party); JIMMY NOLASCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less