Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 13:51:18 (UTC).

GABRIEL JUAREZ VS IMMACULATE ROOFING CO LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 GABRIEL JUAREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against IMMACULATE ROOFING CO LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7106

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JUAREZ GABRIEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

IMMACULATE ROOFING CO. LLC

GONZALEZ DEREK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ELIHU KAVEH S. ESQ.

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

Defendant Attorney

RUBIN MICHAEL PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/2/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE SANCTS.

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE SANCTS.

Minute Order

2/8/2018: Minute Order

JOINT WITNESS LIST

8/29/2018: JOINT WITNESS LIST

AMENDED PLAINTIFF GABRIEL JUAREZ'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5: TO EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY

9/19/2018: AMENDED PLAINTIFF GABRIEL JUAREZ'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5: TO EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY

Exhibit List

4/5/2019: Exhibit List

Minute Order

4/12/2019: Minute Order

Order

4/12/2019: Order

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

4/29/2019: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Minute Order

4/29/2019: Minute Order

Jury Question

5/2/2019: Jury Question

Unknown

5/9/2019: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/14/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/30/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

5/15/2017: Minute Order

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

7/13/2017: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

Unknown

11/22/2017: Unknown

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • at 10:21 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (COURT ORDER) of 05/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 3:05 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (NUNC PRO TUNC) of 05/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (NUNC PRO TUNC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (COURT ORDER) of 05/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • at 4:15 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gabriel Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 71; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Gabriel Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. RETALIATION (CAL. LABOR CODE 98.6); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN MICHAEL PHILIP