This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 19:59:32 (UTC).

GABRIEL GREEN VS MICHAEL TENOFSKY M D ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2016 GABRIEL GREEN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MICHAEL TENOFSKY M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN J. KRALIK, PATRICIA D. NIETO, HUEY P. COTTON, ELAINE W. MANDEL, SHIRLEY K. WATKINS and VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8131

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN J. KRALIK

PATRICIA D. NIETO

HUEY P. COTTON

ELAINE W. MANDEL

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

GREEN GABRIEL

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Respondents and Defendants

TENOFSKY MICHAEL M.D.

DAVID M. GROSSMAN M.D. MEDICAL

DOES 1 TO 100

GROSSMAN DAVID M. M.D.

SOUTH VALLEY PHYSICIANS GROUP INC.

SIGNATURE MD INC.

GROSSMAN M.D. DAVID M.

DOES 1-100

TENOFSKY M.D. MICHAEL

DMG PERSONALIZED MEDICINE

DAVID M. GROSSMAN M.D. MEDICAL CORP.

SIGNATURE MD INC

DMG PERSONALIZED MEDICINE INC. A CALIFO

SOUTH VALLEY PHYSICIAN GROUP INC. A CAL

DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

SOUTH VALLEY PHYSICIAN GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DMG PERSONALIZED MEDICINE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AGULNEK M.D. AN INDIVIDUAL ROBERT M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KOSLYN PAMELA ESQ.

MINNA DENNIS FRANK

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

BROWNE GEORGE ROSS LLP

SCHMID & VOILES

GEORGE ERIC MARC

LAMB MICHAEL VINCENT

CAYLEY JOHN STAFFORD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

2/27/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

1/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

1/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial/Discovery and to set Motions for Summary Judgment

11/28/2018: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial/Discovery and to set Motions for Summary Judgment

Answer - Answer to the First, Fourth and Sixth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Corrected Second Amended Complaint

11/13/2018: Answer - Answer to the First, Fourth and Sixth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Corrected Second Amended Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES

12/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/21/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID M. GROSSMAN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

6/28/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID M. GROSSMAN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Exhibit List

6/28/2019: Exhibit List

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL

5/24/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS JANUARY 8, 2019 AND JANUARY 18, 2019 ORDERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARAT

4/12/2019: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS JANUARY 8, 2019 AND JANUARY 18, 2019 ORDERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARAT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/27/2019 and a copy of the Ruling on Submitted Matter filed 2-27-19

2/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/27/2019 and a copy of the Ruling on Submitted Matter filed 2-27-19

Request for Judicial Notice

9/13/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

6/13/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter -

8/14/2018: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter -

Minute Order -

1/4/2018: Minute Order -

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

12/19/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

370 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAppellate Order Extension of Time (NOA: 04/05/21 B3102055); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U" Appeal); Filed by Gabriel Green (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Renewed Motion by Plaintiff for New Trial (C.C.P., 1008(b))) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
697 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-07-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gabriel Green (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gabriel Green (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC608131    Hearing Date: November 25, 2020    Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULING

11/25/2020

GREEN V TENOFSKY Case No. BC608131

MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

DENIED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINNA DENNIS F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOSLYN PAMELA ESQ.