This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:35:46 (UTC).

FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER VS DEPT OF HEAL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2016 FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against DEPT OF HEAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0885

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL

COMMUNITY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEPHENSON ACQUISTO & COL

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

NEWMAN TARA L. DEPUTY ATTY GEN.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

3/9/2016: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

3/11/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

Proof of Service

4/12/2016: Proof of Service

ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

5/2/2016: ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

Minute Order

5/24/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/21/2016: Minute Order

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

7/12/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/12/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/12/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

9/12/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE - OTHER: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

9/20/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE - OTHER: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE - OTHER: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • at 09:32 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • at 09:31 AM in Department 82; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Fresno Community Hospital and Medical (Plaintiff); Community Regional Medical Center (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Department of Health Care Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fresno Community Hospital and Medical (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Community Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEWMAN TARA L. DEPUTY ATTY GEN.