This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 01:57:35 (UTC).

FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY VS BELGIUM INTERNATIONAL ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2016 FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BELGIUM INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4758

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY INC.

Defendants

BELGIUM INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED

ZAVALES WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHUCK & TSOONG LLP

CHUCK STEPHEN CRAIG

Defendant Attorneys

GREENBERG GLUSKER FIELDS CLAMAN & ...

DAVIDOFF BRIAN LESLIE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice

2/19/2016: Notice

Summons

2/19/2016: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2016: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown

2/19/2016: Unknown

Unknown

2/19/2016: Unknown

Summons

3/10/2016: Summons

Unknown

3/10/2016: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/23/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/23/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/23/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

5/4/2016: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

5/5/2016: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

5/6/2016: Unknown

Case Management Statement

6/30/2016: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/6/2016: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

7/12/2016: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

8/4/2016: Case Management Statement

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (reDismissal in Light of Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; (Order to Show Cause) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (reDismissal in Light of Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: re: Dismissal in Light of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Notice (of ruling); Filed by FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Summons; Filed by FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued (- COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CONVERSION; 2. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 3. RECOVERY OF BAILED PROPERTY [CIVIL CODE 3379-3380]... - RECEIPT: GLN538418024 02-19-16); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Notice (Of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Summons; Filed by FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRENCH DESIGN JEWELRY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUCK STEPHEN C.