This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:39:18 (UTC).

FREDDIE CANO VS MERCURY PLASTICS INC.,

Case Summary

On 08/24/2016 FREDDIE CANO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MERCURY PLASTICS INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8676

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANO FREDDIE

Defendants

MERCURY PLASTICS INC

MERCURY PLASTICS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODE ESQ. LAUREN

Defendant Attorney

WUCETICH PETER L. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; (Status Conference after Arb./Med.; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Ord of Disml with prejudice; Filed by FREDDIE CANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; (Status Conference after Arb./Med.; Continued by Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • at 08:31 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Reply; Filed by MERCURY PLASTICS, INC., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Motion to Compel; Filed by MERCURY PLASTICS, INC., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by FREDDIE CANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by FREDDIE CANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Answer; Filed by MERCURY PLASTICS, INC., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by FREDDIE CANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by FREDDIE CANO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less