This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 10:57:04 (UTC).

FRANK M. RIVAS VS. LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 08/11/2010 FRANK M RIVAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A. SAHAGUN, TORRIBIO, JOHN A. and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6970

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

TORRIBIO, JOHN A.

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVAS FRANK M.

Defendant

LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUEDTKE ERIC V. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

GIBEAUT MAHAN & BRISCOE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice; e/a of all parties and all causes of action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL FOR F.T.A. MSCPER M/O 10-04-11) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department C; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department C, Raul A. Sahagun, Presiding; Motion for Summary Judgment (9/22/11 O/C PER MOVING PARTY;) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department C; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2010
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT A CA PUBLIC is a litigant