This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2016 at 01:41:31 (UTC).

FRANCISCO VICENTE-VELASQUEZ VS. FABIOLA PALOMARES

Case Summary

On 05/14/2014 FRANCISCO VICENTE-VELASQUEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FABIOLA PALOMARES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LOWRY, STEPHEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8029

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LOWRY, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VICENTE-VELASQUEZ FRANCISCO

Respondent

PALOMARES FABIOLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REBEIL CRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2016
  • Notice-FCCR Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Notice-Case Review Re: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Notice-Case Review Re Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • Notice-Limited Scope Representatio (ATTORNEY: CRISTI REBEIL ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Declaration Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • Notice-Related Cases Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Request-Custody and/or Visitation (FEES previously paid under TF00682 4 ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Declaration-Property Instructions Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Petition-Dissolution (FEES previously paid under TF00682 4 *CASE DISMISSED 04-11-16, pe r court order ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REBEIL CRISTINA