This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2020 at 21:17:34 (UTC).

FRANCIENE BLACK VS ANDREW JOSHUA TAFOYA ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/16/2011 FRANCIENE BLACK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANDREW JOSHUA TAFOYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L. HESS and MATTHEW ST. GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7693

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT L. HESS

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLACK FRANCIENE

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

TAFOYA ANDREW JOSHUA

TAFOYA REGINALD ANDREW

WINTERS SALLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARMENTA M. CRIS

Defendant Attorney

BREDLAU RICHARD R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/30/2011: Notice of Case Management Conference

SUMMONS -

8/16/2011: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) CUSTODIAL INTERFERENCE; ETC

8/16/2011: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) CUSTODIAL INTERFERENCE; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/22/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/1/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/6/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF RICHARD R. BREDLAU; SALLY WINTER; AND ANDREW REGINALD TAFOYA

9/29/2011: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF RICHARD R. BREDLAU; SALLY WINTER; AND ANDREW REGINALD TAFOYA

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT SALLY WINTER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/3/2011: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT SALLY WINTER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF JOINDER BY DEFENDANT ANDREW REGINALD TAFOYA IN DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SALLY WINTER

10/11/2011: NOTICE OF JOINDER BY DEFENDANT ANDREW REGINALD TAFOYA IN DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SALLY WINTER

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

10/12/2011: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

Minute Order -

10/27/2011: Minute Order -

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

10/27/2011: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

11/21/2011: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

12/6/2011: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

12/16/2011: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

1/4/2012: Minute Order -

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2012
  • Docketat 08:33 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2012-01-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • Docketat 08:33 AM in Department 24; (Motion Hearing; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2011-12-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2011-12-06 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Franciene Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF RICHARD R. BREDLAU; SALLY WINTER; AND ANDREW REGINALD TAFOYA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Franciene Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) CUSTODIAL INTERFERENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Franciene Black (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less