This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2021 at 11:37:35 (UTC).

FOROUGH ETELAEI ET AL VS FIRST GENERAL BANK ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2013 FOROUGH ETELAEI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FIRST GENERAL BANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD, MARC MARMARO and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9769

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

MARC MARMARO

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ELETAEI FOROUGH

ETELAEI FOROUGH

KHALIGH SHAHRZAD PHD

ETELAEI FOROUGH AKA FOROUGH ELETAEL

SHAHRZAD PHD. KHALIGH

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

FIRST GENERAL BANK

STEWART DEFAULT SERVICES

TOUFER BAHRAM

TOUFER BENJAMIN

TOUFER BAHRAM AKA BENJAMIN TOUFER

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HITTELMAN PAUL M. ESQ.

HITTELMAN PAUL M

POSTER MARC J.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HOU ROBIN M. ESQ.

AZADEGAN RAMIN ESQ.

CUNNINGHAM FRANCIS J. III ESQ.

CUNNINGHAM III FRANCIS J.

AZADEGAN RAMIN

Other Attorneys

HARRIS MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

12/6/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

CORRECTED NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/18/2014: CORRECTED NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT FIRST GENERAL BANK'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND THE SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/11/2015: PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT FIRST GENERAL BANK'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND THE SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Minute Order -

6/26/2015: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE (1013A(3) CCP)

8/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE (1013A(3) CCP)

PLAINTIFF SHAHRZAD KHALIGH, PHD'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COMPLAINT IN FAVOR OF FIRST GENERAL BANK

10/13/2015: PLAINTIFF SHAHRZAD KHALIGH, PHD'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COMPLAINT IN FAVOR OF FIRST GENERAL BANK

PROOF OF SERVICE (C.C.P. SECTIONS 1013(A) AND 2015.5)

1/15/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE (C.C.P. SECTIONS 1013(A) AND 2015.5)

DEFENDANT TOUFER'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAHRZAD KHALIGH SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TOUFER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

3/25/2016: DEFENDANT TOUFER'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAHRZAD KHALIGH SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TOUFER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT BAHRAM TOUFER AKA BENJAMIN TOUFER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/5/2016: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT BAHRAM TOUFER AKA BENJAMIN TOUFER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING

10/7/2016: NOTICE OF RULING

AZADEGAN LAW GROUP?S REPLY TO BENJAMIN TOUFER?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF RAMIN AZADEGAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/31/2016: AZADEGAN LAW GROUP?S REPLY TO BENJAMIN TOUFER?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF RAMIN AZADEGAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order -

12/12/2016: Minute Order -

COURT'S RULING

2/2/2017: COURT'S RULING

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

3/21/2017: APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

Minute Order -

9/11/2017: Minute Order -

BRIEF REGARDING RIGHT OF FIRST GENERAL BANK TO PARTICIPATE AT TRIAL

9/18/2017: BRIEF REGARDING RIGHT OF FIRST GENERAL BANK TO PARTICIPATE AT TRIAL

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

9/19/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

JUDGMENT

10/16/2017: JUDGMENT

253 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • Hearing03/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Hearing03/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 37; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by First General Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketBrief (of First General Bank in Advance of Final Status Conference Re: Plaintiffs' Entitlement to Jury Trial); Filed by First General Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Further Status Conference (Regarding Status of Discovery) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
547 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2013
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Forough Etelaei (Plaintiff); Forough Eletaei (Legacy Party); Khaligh Shahrzad, Phd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Forough Etelaei (Plaintiff); Forough Eletaei (Legacy Party); Khaligh Shahrzad, Phd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CANCELLATION OF DEED OF TRUST AND NOTICE OF DEFAULT AND FOR DAMAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Forough Etelaei (Plaintiff); Forough Eletaei (Legacy Party); Khaligh Shahrzad, Phd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Forough Etelaei (Plaintiff); Khaligh Shahrzad, Phd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: I. CANCELLATION OF DEED OF TRUST AND NOTICE OF DEFAULT AND FOR DAMAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST GENERAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where STEWART DEFAULT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS MICHAEL