Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2016 at 13:28:03 (UTC).

FORCE FRAMING, INC. VS CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2008 FORCE FRAMING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY THORNTON HOUSE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7703

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY THORNTON HOUSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORCE FRAMING INC.

Defendants and Respondents

THE GUARANTEE CO. OF NORTH AMERICA USA

KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (DOE 1)

CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

MANCHESTER & BELFORD INVESTORS LLC.

KEYBANK REAL ESTATE CAPITAL COMMERCIAL MO

KEYBANK REAL ESTATE CAPITAL COMMERCIAL

INTRACORP LOS ANGELES L.L.C.

KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

KEYCORP REAL ESTATE CAPITAL MARKETS INC.

MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC

GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA

MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC.

KEYBANK HOMEBUILDER GROUP

MANCHESTER & BELFORD INVESTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARNO ANNA M. ESQ.

CARNO & CARLTON LLP.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KAYE SCHOLER FIERMAN HAYS & HANDLER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR : 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

7/10/2008: COMPLAINT FOR : 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS

7/10/2008: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/10/2008: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/11/2008: AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

7/14/2008: NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/7/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/7/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/7/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

8/12/2008: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/13/2008: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT -CIVIL

8/27/2008: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT -CIVIL

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/29/2008: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/18/2008: Minute Order

DEFENDANT KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATIONS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

10/1/2008: DEFENDANT KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATIONS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

10/3/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/27/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/24/2008: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/18/2008: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2009
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2008
  • Default Entered (AS THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, A MICHIGAN CORP ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO MANCHESTER & BELFOR, LLC;MANCHESTER BELFORD INVESTORS,LLC; AND INTRACORP LOS ANGELES,LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2008
  • Default Entered (AS CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A UTAH CORP ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • Amendment to Complaint (HAVING DISCOVERED THE TRUE NAME OF THE DEFENDANT TO BE ANDREW C. CARLTON (DOE 1) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (SERVED: KEYBANK REAL ESTATE CAPITAL MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (MANCHESTER & BELFORD INVESTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: MANCHESTER & BELFORD, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: KEYCORP REAL ESTATE CAPITAL MARKETS, INC., AN OHIO CORPORATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • Notice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: INTRACORP LOS ANGELES,LLC, A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, A MICHIGAN CORPORATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: KEYCORP REAL ESTATE CAPITAL MARKETS, INC., AN OHIO CORPORATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED: CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A UTAH CORPORATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • Notice (OF PENDING ACTION. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTRACORP LOS ANGELES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Keybank Real Estate Capital is a litigant

Latest cases where FORCE FRAMING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC is a litigant