Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 13:38:32 (UTC).

FORA FINANCIAL WEST LLC VS YOO KIM

Case Summary

On 10/03/2016 FORA FINANCIAL WEST LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YOO KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6181

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FORA FINANCIAL WEST LLC

Defendants and Respondents

HANS ACADEMY OF MASSAGE

KIM YOO

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KATZ STUART A. ESQ.

PC STUART A. KATZ

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

4/10/2018: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

4/10/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

Unknown

4/15/2019: Unknown

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

5/1/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution

5/2/2019: Writ of Execution

SUMMONS

10/3/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

10/3/2016: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOT FOUND PROOF OF SERVICE

10/31/2016: NOT FOUND PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/4/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/5/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/13/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/22/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/22/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

2/22/2017: Minute Order

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT; JUDGMENT DEBTOR

7/10/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT; JUDGMENT DEBTOR

Minute Order

10/13/2017: Minute Order

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Fora Financial West, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Fora Financial West, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Writ - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Fora Financial West, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • NOT FOUND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Fora Financial West, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Fora Financial West, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Fora Financial West, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC636181    Hearing Date: January 15, 2021    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

fora financial west, llc,

Plaintiff,

vs.

yoo kim,

Defendant.

Case No.:

BC 636181

Hearing Date:

January 15, 2021

Hearing Time:

10:00 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

Plaintiff and judgment creditor Fora Financial West, LLC (“Plaintiff”) applies for an order for appearance and examination of Defendant and judgment debtor Yoo Kim, individually and dba Hans Academy of Massage. The Court notes that Plaintiff failed to attach a copy of the judgment to the application. (LASC Rule 3.221(a).) Therefore, the application is denied without prejudice.

DATED: January 15, 2021

________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORA FINANCIAL WEST LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant