This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 17:10:12 (UTC).

FLORES, GERALDINE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/24/2015 FLORES, GERALDINE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PENNY, BRENDA and PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8631

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PENNY, BRENDA

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FLORES ANDREW

Claimant

WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH CARE CENTER

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

CITY L. GLENN

SUPERIOR COURT

Interested Party

ADVANCED INHERITANCE LLC

Decedent

FLORES GERALDINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WEISS DAVID E.

 

Court Documents

OTHER - ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFICIAL INTEREST IN DECEDENT'S ESTATE; DECLARATION OF COMPLIANCE: PROOF OF SERVICE

12/22/2015: OTHER - ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFICIAL INTEREST IN DECEDENT'S ESTATE; DECLARATION OF COMPLIANCE: PROOF OF SERVICE

OTHER - SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE

1/27/2016: OTHER - SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

1/28/2016: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Letters of Administration

1/28/2016: Letters of Administration

Application and Order Appointing Probate Referee

1/29/2016: Application and Order Appointing Probate Referee

Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

2/24/2016: Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

$2,175.00 Filed By: Whittier Hills Health Care Center, Claimant

4/20/2016: $2,175.00 Filed By: Whittier Hills Health Care Center, Claimant

Reappraisal for sale / Property tax Certificate Total $ 485,000.00

4/27/2016: Reappraisal for sale / Property tax Certificate Total $ 485,000.00

Inventory and Appraisement - - FINAL & PROPERTY TAX CERTIFICATE - TOTAL: $435,000.00

4/27/2016: Inventory and Appraisement - - FINAL & PROPERTY TAX CERTIFICATE - TOTAL: $435,000.00

Petition - Report and Confirmation of Sale

5/5/2016: Petition - Report and Confirmation of Sale

Inventory & Appraisal - Reappraisal for Sales. Property Tax Certificate total: $470,000.00

6/13/2016: Inventory & Appraisal - Reappraisal for Sales. Property Tax Certificate total: $470,000.00

Declaration - Urgency Declaration Re: Order Confirming Sale

6/13/2016: Declaration - Urgency Declaration Re: Order Confirming Sale

Order - Deposit Funds - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

6/20/2016: Order - Deposit Funds - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Minute Order

9/9/2016: Minute Order

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others)

11/16/2016: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others)

Order - Withdrawal of Funds - From Blocked Account

1/3/2017: Order - Withdrawal of Funds - From Blocked Account

Order - Final Distribution - Settling Final Report and Directing Final Distribution

1/3/2017: Order - Final Distribution - Settling Final Report and Directing Final Distribution

Order - Withdrawal of Funds - From Blocked Account

1/3/2017: Order - Withdrawal of Funds - From Blocked Account

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketOrder - Withdrawal of Funds (From Blocked Account )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketOrder - Withdrawal of Funds (From Blocked Account )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketOrder - Final Distribution (Settling Final Report and Directing Final Distribution )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketOrder - Final Distribution (Settling Final Report and Directing Final Distribution )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketSupplement (Second Verified To The First and Final Account And Report of Administrator, Etc.. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketAllowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) (Claim allowed $2,175.00 Whittier Hills Health Care Center ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketAllowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketReceipt (From Creditor ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketBond (ANDREW FLORES BOND: $6,000.00 Filed by: Surety Company Posted By: Flores, Andrew, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Docketin Stanley Mosk Dept. - 99, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Appointment - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Docketin Stanley Mosk Dept. - 99, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Appointment - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketProof of Publication (Filed By: Flores, Andrew, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketSupplement (Filed By: Flores, Andrew, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketAssignment (Filed By: Advanced Inheritance, LLC, Real Party in Interest )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (Filed By: Advanced Inheritance, LLC, Real Party in Interest )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Petitioner in Pro Per )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order LIMITED IAEA 1st Hearing Date: 01/13/2016 Filed By: Flores, Andrew, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (Filed by: Real Party in Interest )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCE INHERITANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY L. GLENN is a litigant