This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 18:07:11 (UTC).

FLEET LOGIC, LLC VS. TWENTY6 LETTERS CORP.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2016 FLEET LOGIC, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TWENTY6 LETTERS CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and PAUL BRUGUERA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5842

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

PAUL BRUGUERA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLEET LOGIC LLC

VELOCITY TRUCK RENTAL & LEASING

Defendants

TWENTY6 LETTERS CORP. A NEVADA CORP.

CHILDRESS TIM AN INDIVIDUAL

CHILDRESS PAIGE

CHILDRESS TIM

CHILDRESS PAIGE AN INDIVIDUAL

CHILDRESS AN INDIVIDUAL TIM

CHILDRESS AN INDIVIDUAL PAIGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE VANDERPOOL LAW FIRM

TOVAR HEATHER ANN

VANDERPOOL DOUGLAS BRENT

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAM Y. SUNG

COOPER MICHAEL H

CLIFFORD JOHN STEWART

 

Court Documents

Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS

8/15/2019: Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

2/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HEATHER A. TOVAR IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION

11/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HEATHER A. TOVAR IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION

Notice of Ruling

11/24/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

6/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/29/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

12/29/2016: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice of Entry of Judgment

1/17/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT

2/21/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION DOCUMENT FILED

3/1/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION DOCUMENT FILED

Notice of Motion -

8/2/2018: Notice of Motion -

Motion to Compel -

8/3/2018: Motion to Compel -

Motion to Compel -

8/3/2018: Motion to Compel -

Motion to Compel -

8/3/2018: Motion to Compel -

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

9/13/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

9/13/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories

10/26/2018: Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories

195 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • Hearing06/09/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Hearing05/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (For Production Set One) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Special Interrogatories, Set One) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Form Interrogatories Set One) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by FLEET LOGIC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCourt Order/Ruling (Hearing 11-24-20); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses For P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
350 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 10/11/16 Affadavit of Reasonable Diligence attached ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/11/16 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by FLEET LOGIC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FLEET LOGIC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by VELOCITY TRUCK RENTAL & LEASING (Legacy Party); FLEET LOGIC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC065842    Hearing Date: November 24, 2020    Dept: C

FLEET LOGIC, LLC v. TWENTY6 LETTERS CORP., et al.

CASE NO.:  VC065842

HEARING 11/24/20 @ 1:30 PM

JUDGE: JOHN A. TORRIBIO

#3

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendants Tim and Paige Childress’s motions to compel further discovery are MOOT. Defendants partially withdrew the substantive part of the motions.

Request for sanctions is DENIED.

Plaintiff to give NOTICE.

Defendants Tim and Paige Childress move to compel further responses to discovery. On 10/6/20, Defendants partially withdrew their motions because supplemental responses were provided. However, Defendants retain their request for sanctions.

The court finds that sanctions are not warranted in this instance because Plaintiff believed that discovery cut-off was 2/24/20. At that time, trial was set for 3/23/20, and discovery cut-off was 2/24/20.

On 2/24/20, the court granted Defendants’ request to continue trial “as set by Dept. F” and extended discovery to run with the continued trial date. However, at that time, Dept. F had not set a new trial date.

Due to Covid-19 and the court shut down, the trial date was not reset by Dept. F until 4/21/20, and discovery was then ordered to coincide with the new trial date.

Plaintiff thereafter served supplemental responses. In opposition, Plaintiff also requests sanctions against Defendants.

The court finds that substantial justification exists on both sides. At the time Plaintiff’s responses were due, it was unclear when discovery cut-off would take place. Defendants also had substantial justification because the court granted their request to continue trial and extend discovery cut-off, but due to extenuating circumstances, did not set a new trial date until 4/21/20.

Both parties’ requests for sanctions are DENIED.

Case Number: VC065842    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: SEC

FLEET LOGIC, LLC v. TWENTY6 LETTERS CORP., et al.

CASE NO.:  VC065842

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

HEARING 12/10/19

#10

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendants Tim and Paige Childress’s motion to set aside and vacate ruling re sanctions is DENIED.

Plaintiff to give NOTICE.

Defendants Tim and Paige Childress move to set aside and vacate the ruling re sanctions pursuant to CCP 473.

The court may, upon any terms as may be just, relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him or her through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect. (CCP 473(b).)

Defendants contend that their previous motions to quash were not made in bad faith and that the court “completely disregarded the operative motion itself.” (Motion, 4:25.) Defendants are essentially disagreeing with the court’s prior order. Such does not establish mistake, inadvertence, surprise or excusable neglect. Further, even if this motion is construed as a motion for reconsideration, the motion would be untimely. CCP 1008 requires that the motion be filed within 10 days of the order. The Order was issued on 10/10/19, but the motion was not filed until 11/8/19.

Further, Defendants contend the court denied their motions based solely on the lack of a separate statement. However, as this court stated in its 10/10/19 Order, Defendants did not attach the subpoenas at issue, and the court had no way of knowing what documents are being demanded or objected to. For this reason, the motions were denied. Defense counsel appeared at the hearing and failed to address this court's concerns.

Accordingly, the motion is DENIED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLEET LOGIC LLC DBA VELOCITY TRUCK RENTAL & LEASING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLIFFORD JOHN S. ESQ.