Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 10:05:21 (UTC).

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY VS DARRELL BLANTON ET

Case Summary

On 07/28/2015 FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DARRELL BLANTON ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9419

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

BLANTON DARRELL

BRIDGEFORTH OZINE SR.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

BRIDGEFORTH OZINE JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CLOUD W. DEAN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ROSE RUTH C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

7/28/2015: SUMMONS

CROSS-COMPLAINT 1 DECLARATORY RELIEF; 2 .NEGLIGENCE; 3. DETRIMENT IN RELIANCE.

8/31/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINT 1 DECLARATORY RELIEF; 2 .NEGLIGENCE; 3. DETRIMENT IN RELIANCE.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO FIRST AMERICAN'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/16/2015: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO FIRST AMERICAN'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

DECLARATION

12/7/2015: DECLARATION

PROOF OF SERVICE?CIVIL

12/9/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE?CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE?CIVIL

12/9/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE?CIVIL

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO FIRST AMERICAN'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL

1/8/2016: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO FIRST AMERICAN'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL

DECLARATION OF RUTH C ROSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

5/4/2016: DECLARATION OF RUTH C ROSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

5/6/2016: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

DECLARATION OF RUTH C. ROSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

5/6/2016: DECLARATION OF RUTH C. ROSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

PLAINTIFF, FIRST AMERICANS REPLY TO DEFENDANT, DARRELL BLANTONS OPPOSITION TO FIRST AMERICANS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

5/6/2016: PLAINTIFF, FIRST AMERICANS REPLY TO DEFENDANT, DARRELL BLANTONS OPPOSITION TO FIRST AMERICANS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF RULING

5/17/2016: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF RECISSION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF OZINE BRIDGEFORTH, SR.

11/23/2016: NOTICE OF RECISSION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF OZINE BRIDGEFORTH, SR.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SECOND SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

12/6/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SECOND SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO FIRST AMERICAN'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

1/30/2017: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO FIRST AMERICAN'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order

2/28/2017: Minute Order

MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

6/9/2017: MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/9/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Cost Bill After Judgment; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 68; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 68; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
190 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT 1 DECLARATORY RELIEF; 2 .NEGLIGENCE; 3. DETRIMENT IN RELIANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: I. FRAUDULENT MISREPRESENTATION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSE RUTH CECILIA