Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 15:23:30 (UTC).

FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INS CO VS JUAN M AMEZQUITA

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INS CO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JUAN M AMEZQUITA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and BRIAN F. GASDIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2935

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

BRIAN F. GASDIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMP-

RAGO PATRICIA

FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

RAGO JAMES J.

RAGO JAMES P.

FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE

Defendants and Respondents

AMEZQUITA JUAN M.

DOES 1 THROUGH 30

AMEZQUITA MANUEL

AMEZQUITA MANUEL DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD W. HESS JR.

PBN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

PBN LAW GROUP

NGHIEM PHILLIP BAO

HESS JR. EDWARD W LAW OFFICES OF

HESS EDWARD WILLIAM JR ESQ.

HESS EDWARD WILLIAM JR

Defendant Attorneys

MOON MICHAEL FRANCIS ESQ.

VOLTZ JENNIFER LYNNE

KINKLE RODIGER AND SPRIGGS

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE

1/30/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

2/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ADVANCEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF JURY TRIAL) OF 04/03/2020

4/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ADVANCEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF JURY TRIAL) OF 04/03/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

6/1/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

Motion for Summary Judgment

1/25/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement - Separate Statement Material Facts in support of M.S.J.

1/25/2018: Separate Statement - Separate Statement Material Facts in support of M.S.J.

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply/Response

3/29/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply/Response

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

5/11/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00

6/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00

7/9/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information -

7/13/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information -

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings)

12/4/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings)

Notice of Ruling

12/5/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

1/3/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

Order - Order re: hearing of 2/26/19

2/26/2019: Order - Order re: hearing of 2/26/19

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/1/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • Hearing02/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Hearing02/03/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel (the Depositions of Plaintiff's Experts) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Compel (the Depositions of Plaintiff's Experts) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketOrder (/ Ruling Hearing 6-25-20); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
210 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED JUAN M. AMEZQUITA BY SUB SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE-PROPERTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC612935    Hearing Date: June 25, 2020    Dept: SEC

FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. AMEZQUITA

CASE NO.: BC612935

HEARING: 06/25/2020

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

#8

TENTATIVE RULING

Defendants’ Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff’s Experts is DENIED.

Opposing Party to give notice.

No Reply filed as of June 22, 2020. Due by June 18, 2020. (CCP §1005(b).)

Defendants move to compel the deposition of Plaintiff’s Experts. The Opposition objects to the Motion on the grounds that it is untimely under CCP §2024.030.

“On receipt of an expert witness list from a party, any other party may take the deposition of any person on the list.” (CCP §2034.410.) “Any party shall be entitled as a matter of right to complete discovery proceedings pertaining to a witness identified under Chapter 18…on or before the 15th day, and to have motions concerning that discovery heard on or before the 10th day, before the date initially set for the trial of the action.” (CCP §2024.030.)

Defendants’ Motion to compel the depositions of Plaintiff’s Expert Witnesses is DENIED as untimely. This action was filed on or about March 8, 2016. According to the Court’s docket, trial was originally set for on or about May 15, 2018. As indicated by Plaintiff in Opposition, the original trial date has been continued numerous times. However, “[e]xcept as provided in Section 2024.050, a continuance or postponement of the trial date does not operate to reopen discovery proceedings.” (CCP §2024.020(b).)

On Motion of any party, the Court may grant leave to complete discovery, have a motion concerning discovery heard closer to the initial trial date, or to reopen discovery after a new trial date has been set. (CCP §2024.050(a).) No such Motion has been brought by either party.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOON MICHAEL F.