This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2020 at 13:34:04 (UTC).

FIRMIN LOPEZ VS A W CHESTERTON COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2009 FIRMIN LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD FRUIN, RUTH ANN KWAN and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9214

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD FRUIN

RUTH ANN KWAN

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOPEZ FIRMIN

Defendants and Respondents

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

BECHTEL GROUP INC.

BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC.

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

CBS CORPORATION

CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

DOES 1-350

DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC.

EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY

FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY LLC

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE US INC.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

FRYER-KNOWLES INC

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

99 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HOWARD CRYSTAL G. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GORDON & REES LLP

LATHAM & WATKINS

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

K & L GATES LLP

MAXWELL MIRIAM P.

JACKSON& WALLACE LLP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

BARG COFFIN LEWIS & TRAPP LLP

MC KENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

LOW BALL & LUNCH

DEHAY AND ELLISTON LLP

HAMBLETT ROBERT M. ESQ.

HANSON BRIDGET LLP

L'ORANGE H. CHRISTIAN ESQ.

BASSI EDLIN HUIE & BLUM LLP

BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

LANGBORD PETER B. ESQ.

BOOTH MITCHEL & STRANGE LLP

44 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/9/2009: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS; ETC.

3/9/2009: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS; ETC.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/18/2009: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/18/2009: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE, ET.C

3/19/2009: AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE, ET.C

ANSWER OF RILEY POWER INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS, ETC.

3/19/2009: ANSWER OF RILEY POWER INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS, ETC.

Minute Order

3/23/2009: Minute Order

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MATTER OF DEPARTMENT 1

3/26/2009: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MATTER OF DEPARTMENT 1

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/27/2009: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

3/27/2009: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

MONSANTO COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ( ASBESTOS ) AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

3/27/2009: MONSANTO COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ( ASBESTOS ) AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES

3/27/2009: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES

PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

3/30/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

3/30/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

3/30/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

3/30/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

3/30/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

3/30/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

269 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • Docketat 08:32 am in Department 15, Richard Fruin, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (UPON SETTLEMENT) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • Docketat 05:00 pm in Department 15, Richard Fruin, Presiding; Court Order - Court's ruling and order entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT; ONLY AS TO DEFT JOHN CRANE INC WITH A MUTAL WAIVER OF COSTS ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2009
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • DocketNotice (OF REASSIGNMENT OF MATTER TO DEPT 1 ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • Docketat 03:00 pm in Department 72, RUTH ANN KWAN, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • DocketAffidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1990
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eastman Chemical Company is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY LLC is a litigant