This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 18:25:27 (UTC).

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY VS NORMAN, FOX & CO.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2011 FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NORMAN, FOX CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN KUHL, OKI, DAN THOMAS and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1759

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN KUHL

OKI, DAN THOMAS

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

NORMAN FOX & CO.

Other

FILE COPY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIRSCH JOSHUA E.

GIBSON ROBB AND LINCH LLP

Defendant Attorney

GRAYSON MARTIN L. LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2012
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (FSC=07-12-12TD=07-26-12) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION W PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketNotice (OF RULING ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by NORMAN, FOX & CO. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial and MSC Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department F, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial and MSC Set

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMAN FOX & CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant