This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:42:19 (UTC).

FERNANDO ALVAREZ ET AL VS WESLEY HEALTH CENTERS ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 FERNANDO ALVAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WESLEY HEALTH CENTERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER, DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2011

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MORENO WILLIAM

MORENO FRANK GOMEZ

ALVAREZ FERNANDO

Defendants and Respondents

IKEMEFUNA VALERIE

PIH HEALTH CARE SOLUTIONS

ORENS ORENS M.D.

DOES 1 TO 10

WESLEY HEALTH CENTERS

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL-DOWNEY (DOE 1)

ORENS MARTIN M.D.

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL-DOWNEY DOE 1

IKEMEFUNA VALERIE SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL-DOWNEY DOE 1

Cross Defendants

DOWRAD MEDICAL GROUP

SHAHANGIAN MICHAEL M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF NEIL M. HOWARD

Defendant Attorneys

KJAR JAMES J. ESQ.

MCKENNA ROBERT L. III. ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FRASER STEPHEN C. ESQ.

SHUBE SUSAN ELISE ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

TROTTER MICHAEL JOHN ESQ.

WONG LAWRENCE DAVID ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Statement of the Case

6/21/2019: Statement of the Case

Motion in Limine

6/21/2019: Motion in Limine

Legacy Document

7/26/2016: Legacy Document

Joinder

5/16/2017: Joinder

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT VALERIE IKEMEFUNA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF REPLY

1/4/2018: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT VALERIE IKEMEFUNA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF REPLY

Motion in Limine

1/17/2018: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

1/17/2018: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

1/17/2018: Motion in Limine

Statement of the Case

1/24/2018: Statement of the Case

Legacy Document

1/31/2018: Legacy Document

PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING ANY WITNESSES, EVIDENCE, OR CONTENTIONS NOT DISCLOSED IN RESPONSES TO DISC

2/1/2018: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING ANY WITNESSES, EVIDENCE, OR CONTENTIONS NOT DISCLOSED IN RESPONSES TO DISC

Legacy Document

2/22/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

5/16/2018: Minute Order

Order

10/22/2018: Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/26/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/9/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ORDER RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT BY DEFENDANT MARTIN ORENS, M.D.

8/17/2016: ORDER RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT BY DEFENDANT MARTIN ORENS, M.D.

DECLARATION OF RACHAEL KOGEN IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY

10/23/2017: DECLARATION OF RACHAEL KOGEN IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY

259 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Fernando Alvarez (Plaintiff); William Moreno (Plaintiff); Frank Gomez Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by Michael, M.D. Shahangian (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (#5 to Preclude Plaintiff and Cross-Complainant from Exam Experts as to their Personal Practices); Filed by Michael, M.D. Shahangian (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketJury Instructions; Filed by PIH Health Hospital-Downey (Doe 1) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by PIH Health Hospital-Downey (Doe 1) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by PIH Health Hospital-Downey (Doe 1) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
327 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketDEMAND OF DEFENDANT PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PIH Health Hospital-Downey (Doe 1) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by PIH Health Hospital-Downey (Doe 1) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Fernando Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Unlimited; Filed by Fernando Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fernando Alvarez (Plaintiff); William Moreno (Plaintiff); Frank Gomez Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOWRAD MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Wesley Health Centers is a litigant

Latest cases where PIH Health Care Solutions is a litigant

Latest cases where DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-HOSPITAL is a litigant