This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 15:33:42 (UTC).

FERDINAND BODDIE VS. CONOCO PHILLIPS REFINERY, INC., ET-AL

Case Summary

On 01/09/2013 FERDINAND BODDIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CONOCO PHILLIPS REFINERY, INC , ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7134

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BODDIE FERDINAND

Claimant

NATIONAL INTERSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

CONOCO PHILLIPS REFINERY INC.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEINBRECHER AND ASSOCIATES LAW OFFICES

Claimant Attorney

STOCKWELL HARRIS WOOLVERTON & MUEHL .

Defendant Attorney

VALINOTI SPECTER & DITO LLP

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/17/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY?S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/22/2013: CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY?S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/22/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

6/5/2013: Minute Order

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF TJNDISPUATED MATERIALS FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/24/2014: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF TJNDISPUATED MATERIALS FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/24/2014: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93) (VIA FAX/EMAIL)

9/29/2014: REQUEST FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93) (VIA FAX/EMAIL)

PROOF OF SERVICE TO ESTENSON LOGISTICS, INC. OF PLAINTIFF'S INTENTION TO SETTLE EXCLUSIVE OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION LIEN

10/20/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE TO ESTENSON LOGISTICS, INC. OF PLAINTIFF'S INTENTION TO SETTLE EXCLUSIVE OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION LIEN

DECLARATION OF EDWARD STEINBRECHER, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/30/2014: DECLARATION OF EDWARD STEINBRECHER, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/12/2014: CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Proof of Service

11/12/2014: Proof of Service

Minute Order

12/15/2014: Minute Order

RULING RE: PETITION BY NATIONAL INTERSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION

12/15/2014: RULING RE: PETITION BY NATIONAL INTERSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF OR PLAINTIFF?S EXPERTS FROM REFERENCING CAL-OSHA REGULATION 8 CALIFORNIA CODE OF REGULATION ? 1670; DECLARATION OF EDW

12/26/2014: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF OR PLAINTIFF?S EXPERTS FROM REFERENCING CAL-OSHA REGULATION 8 CALIFORNIA CODE OF REGULATION ? 1670; DECLARATION OF EDW

REPLY RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING AS TO THE CONTENTS OF OTHER WJTNESSES'/ CONSULTANTS' REPORTS RELIED UPON

1/2/2015: REPLY RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING AS TO THE CONTENTS OF OTHER WJTNESSES'/ CONSULTANTS' REPORTS RELIED UPON

REPLY RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ANY AND ALL EXPERT REPORTS

1/2/2015: REPLY RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ANY AND ALL EXPERT REPORTS

JOINT WITNESS LIST

1/2/2015: JOINT WITNESS LIST

JOINT AND CONTESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

1/2/2015: JOINT AND CONTESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (w/prej, complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (w/prej, Lien Claimant National Interstate Insurance Company ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTIION OF NATIONAL INTERSTATE INSURANCE CO. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Notice-Settlement (BETWEEN PLFF AND DEFT CONOCO PHILLIPS ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Jury Instructions (FIRST AMENDED JOINT AND CONTESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • Jury Instructions ((PROPOSED) SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION ORDERED BY PLAINTIFF- IN INTERVENTION ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Motion in Limine (#2 TO PRECLUDE PLTF'S EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING AS TO THE CONTENTS OF OTHER WITNESSES'/CONSULTANTS' REPORTS RELIED UPON ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Motion in Limine (#1 TO EXCLUDE ANY AND ALL EXPERT REPORTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Motion in Limine (#3 TO PRECLUDE PLTF OR PLTF'S EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING ABOUT PAST MEDICAL EXPENSES BEYOND THAT PAID FOR BY PLTF'S PRIVATE INSURER OR WORKER'S COMPENSATION INSURER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2013
  • Notice (notice of posting jury fees ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • Notice (OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Notice (CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.