Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 22:12:05 (UTC).

FENG PENGPENG VS MING GANG LI ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2016 FENG PENGPENG filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against MING GANG LI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4755

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENGPENG FENG

Defendants

KLAYMAN ROBERT

LI MING GANG

INTERNET MEDIA DIRECT INC.

INTERNET MEDIA DIRECT LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON DOUGLAS T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by FENG PENGPENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E; Default Prove Up Hearing - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by FENG PENGPENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Notice (OF REJECTION OF FORM OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default (AMENDED COURT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ON 05/04/16) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Request to Enter Default (AMENDED COURT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ON 05/04/16) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Supplemental Declaration; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2016
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by FENG PENGPENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by FENG PENGPENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by FENG PENGPENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by FENG PENGPENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Statement of Damages; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by FENG PENGPENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued (- COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; (2) BREACH OF GUARANTY; (3) FRAUD; AND (4) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY - RECEIPT: GLN538418003 02-19-16); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Summons; Filed by FENG PENGPENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC064755    Hearing Date: February 05, 2021    Dept: E

MOTION FOR EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDER AND ASSIGNMENT OF COMMUNITY PROPERTY INTERESTS AGAINST JUDGMENT DEBTOR’S SPOUSE

[CCP § 706.109]

Date: 2/5/21 (8:30 AM)

Case: Feng Pengpeng v. Ming Gang Li et al. (EC064755)

 

TENTATIVE RULING:

Judgment creditor Feng Pengpeng’s Motion for Issuance of Earnings Withholding Order and Assignment of Community Property Interests is DENIED without prejudice.

CCP § 706.109 provides: “An earnings withholding order may not be issued against the earnings of the spouse of the judgment debtor except by court order upon noticed motion.” Family Code § 910(a) provides: “Except as otherwise expressly provided by statute, the community estate is liable for a debt incurred by either spouse before or during marriage, regardless of which spouse had the management and control of the property and regardless of whether one or both spouses are parties to the debt or to a judgment for the debt.”

Here, judgment creditor fails to provide sufficient evidence that debtor Robert Klayman and Julia Klayman were married at the time the Court entered default judgment on September 16, 2016. (Wu Decl. ¶ 3 & Ex. 1.) The marriage certificate provided by Creditor states that Robert Klayman married “Li Zhu” on October 7, 2006. (Wu Decl. ¶¶ 5, 6 & Ex. 3.) The marriage certificate contains no reference to a Julia Klayman. Indeed, creditor provides no evidence that Li Zhu and Julia Klayman are the same person or any other proof that debtor was ever married to Julia Klayman during the relevant time period. Rather, creditor’s counsel merely avers in a conclusory fashion that Julia Klayman is also known as Li Zhu. (Wu Decl. ¶ 6.)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARDSON DOUGLAS T.