This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 23:50:47 (UTC).

FELIX GARCIA RIVERA ET AL VS SAM HE ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/19/2016 FELIX GARCIA RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAM HE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ, FREDERICK ROTENBERG, CURTIS A. KIN and HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7553

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

FREDERICK ROTENBERG

CURTIS A. KIN

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RUIZ ANGELICA RIVERA

RIVERA FELIX GARCIA

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SHEN FA TRUCKING

CAL STRIPES INC.

COFFMAN/PARSONS

HE SAM

ALCORN FENCE COMPANY

STATEWIDE TRAFFIC AND SAFETY INC.

DOES 1-150

ANTIGO CONSTRUCTION

SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS

KRC SAFETY CO. INC.

CAL STRIPE INC.

SECURITY PAVING CO. INC. (DOE 1) (ROE11)

STATEWIDE TRAFFIC SAFETY AND SIGNS INC.

SECURITY PAVING CO. INC. DOE 1 ROE11

SECURITY PAVING CO. INC.

AGRI-MIX TRANSPORT INC. ROE 10

Intervenor

APPLIED RISK SERVICES INC.

Other

MATHENY SEARS LINKERT & JAIME LLP

49 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorneys

SIEGEL MORENO & STETTLER APC

LAW OFFICES OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM

SULLIVAN & SULLIVAN

PANISH BRIAN J. ESQ.

PANISH SHEA & BOYLE LLP

SHARON ESLAMBOLY HAKIM LAW OFFICES OF

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM

SULLIVAN & SULLIVAN

PANISH BRIAN J. ESQ.

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTENSEN EHRET LLP

SAACKE LAW GROUP THE

GENERAUX MICHELLE R. ESQ.

LEWIS J.PAUL

THE SAACKE LAW GROUP

LINKERT RICHARD S.

WARD KENNETH C. ESQ.

HAMRICK & EVANS LLP

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA LLP

ARCHER NORRIS A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORAT

CHRISTENSEN HSU SIPES LLP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

ANIELSKI JEFFREY M.

SIEGEL MORENO & STETTLER APC

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HAMRICK & EVANS LLP

ARCHER NORRIS A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORAT

HARRIS CHARLES L. ESQ.

44 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

10/4/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL (W/O PREJUDICE)

10/18/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL (W/O PREJUDICE)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF 07/23/19

7/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF 07/23/19

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELSEY MEZZANATTO DANIEL RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

7/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELSEY MEZZANATTO DANIEL RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION FOLLOWING SET...)

7/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION FOLLOWING SET...)

Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DISMISSAL OF ACTION FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT ON JULY 23, 2019

8/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DISMISSAL OF ACTION FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT ON JULY 23, 2019

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONER AS CONSERVATOR OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY AND ENJOINING PROCEEDINGS [INSURANCE CODE 1020]

11/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONER AS CONSERVATOR OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY AND ENJOINING PROCEEDINGS [INSURANCE CODE 1020]

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF 02/22/2020

1/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF 02/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF 03/24/20

3/18/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF 03/24/20

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

3/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/3/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF 07/29-20

7/15/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF 07/29-20

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (...)

7/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (...)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT AS TO APPLIED RISK SERVICES, INC. FOR CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY AS REAL PROPERTY IN INTEREST ONLY; INTERVEN

9/23/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT AS TO APPLIED RISK SERVICES, INC. FOR CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY AS REAL PROPERTY IN INTEREST ONLY; INTERVEN

Request for Dismissal

9/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Complaint

4/19/2016: Complaint

244 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SAM HE (Cross-Complainant); SHEN FA TRUCKING (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SAM HE (Legacy Party); SHEN FA TRUCKING (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FELIX GARCIA RIVERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial dismissal with prejudice complaint as to Applied Risk Services, Inc. for California Insurance Company as real property in interest ONLY; Intervenor retains all rights in Felix Garcia Rivera's workers' compensation claim); Filed by APPLIED RISK SERVICES, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
387 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FELIX GARCIA RIVERA (Plaintiff); ANGELICA RIVERA RUIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where KRC Safety Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL STRIPE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alcorn Fence Company is a litigant