This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2016 at 22:04:50 (UTC).

FAWN GATHRIGHT VS KINDRED HEALTHCARE INC

Case Summary

On 06/26/2014 FAWN GATHRIGHT filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KINDRED HEALTHCARE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, MARC MARMARO and GAIL FEUER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9784

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

MARC MARMARO

GAIL FEUER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GATHRIGHT FAWN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-50

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC.

KINDRED HOSPITAL--LOS ANGELES

KINDRED HOSPITAL-- LA MIRADA

KINDRED HOSP.- L.A. -*AMENDMT

KINDRED HOSP.-LA MIRADA-*AMENDMT

THC -- ORANGE COUNTY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DONALD S. LUCIEN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BEECHER EVAN D.

SHAW VALENZA LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE ? 12940(A) ET. SEQ.; ETC

6/26/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE ? 12940(A) ET. SEQ.; ETC

SUMMONS

6/26/2014: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/23/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

8/5/2014: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/15/2014: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

10/15/2014: Unknown

Unknown

10/15/2014: Unknown

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC.

10/17/2014: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC.

DEFENDANT KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/24/2014: DEFENDANT KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

10/24/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS) DISMISSAL AND CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/29/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS) DISMISSAL AND CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

11/7/2014: Unknown

Unknown

11/18/2014: Unknown

REQUEST FROM RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL AND SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 473(B); ETC

11/19/2014: REQUEST FROM RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL AND SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 473(B); ETC

Minute Order

11/24/2014: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF EVAN D. BEECHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

11/26/2014: DECLARATION OF EVAN D. BEECHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

NOTICE OF RULING ON (1) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS? DISMISSAL AND (2) NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND (3) NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL

11/26/2014: NOTICE OF RULING ON (1) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS? DISMISSAL AND (2) NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND (3) NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL STATEMENT OF DAMAGES; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

11/26/2014: DEFENDANT KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL STATEMENT OF DAMAGES; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2016
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION-with prejudice!!! *Each side to bear her / its own fees and costs ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Points and Authorities (IN SUPPORT MSJ ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Statement of Facts (of undisputed facs ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (evidence in support ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Motion for Summary Judgment (6/10/16 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Notice ( of taking M/to Quash - L.A. & La Mirada - OFF CALENDAR (2) Documents ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • Notice of Hearing (ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL AND CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Answer to Complaint (KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • Amendment to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Declaration (OF NON SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL - LA MIRADA is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL - LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases where THC-ORANGE COUNTY INC. is a litigant