This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 11:30:01 (UTC).

FAUSTO JAIME AYON VS SALON CORONA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/03/2013 FAUSTO JAIME AYON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SALON CORONA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3304

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AYON FAUSTO JAIME

Defendants

CALIFORIA FORCE PATROL INC. - DOE 1

SALON CORONA INC

CORONA SALON

CORONA HACIENDA

CALIFORNIA FORCE PATROL INC. DOE 1

Respondent and Defendant

CORONA SALON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MANUEL H. MILLER

Defendant Attorney

CHAPMAN ARTHUR J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

4/3/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

3/19/2015: Minute Order -

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

6/19/2014: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

6/19/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/6/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/5/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

4/8/2014: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

1/2/2014: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

ANSWER OF SALON CORONA, INC. DBA SALON CORONA TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/12/2013: ANSWER OF SALON CORONA, INC. DBA SALON CORONA TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/25/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/25/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

10/3/2013: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS -

10/3/2013: SUMMONS -

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Not held-No appearances) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Fausto Jaime Ayon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2013
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketANSWER OF SALON CORONA, INC. DBA SALON CORONA TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Salon Corona, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fausto Jaime Ayon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SALON CORONA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAPMAN ARTHUR