This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2021 at 23:21:37 (UTC).

FANTASY COOKIE CORPORATION ET AL VS HAROLD ROTHMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/16/2015 FANTASY COOKIE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HAROLD ROTHMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHANIE M. BOWICK, J. STEPHEN CZULEGER and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8882

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

J. STEPHEN CZULEGER

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FANTASY COOKIE CORPORATION

SEMDER JOSEPH

SEMDER RICHARD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BAR BAKERS LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 140

JACOBS GARY M.

ROSS WILLIAM

ROTHMAN HAROLD

RSR CONSULTING LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 140

JACOBS GARY M.

RSR CONSULTING LLC

Interested Parties and Not Classified By Court

KIND LLC

ANDLER HON. GAIL

FOCALPOINT PARTNERS LLC

ANDLER JUDGE GAIL JAMS INC.

Others

SABA RYAN D. ESQ.

BROCCOLO FRANK J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BUCHALTER NEMER A PROF. CORP.

ADDISON ROBERT JR.

HOBART C. DANA

PENDERGRASS MANCY

MARK DAVID E.

SOHI POOYA E.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FLEMING J. PATRICK JR. ESQ.

SORLEY P. CHRISTOPER

SABA RYAN DONALD

CASE KNOWLSON LLP

ALTER PETER C.

MEYER KRYSTLE D.

FLEMING J. PATRICK JR.

MASSEY ASHTON

YOFFE ALEXANDER

SABA RYAN D.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SORLEY P. CHRISTOPER

YOFFE ALEXANDER

YODER MICHAEL

Cross Defendant Attorney

ADDISON ROBERT S. JR.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LY JOHN K.

Other Attorneys

BORDERS KERI E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 "TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF THOMAS K. SEYMOUR AND ANY EVIDENCE OF ANY FINANCIAL ARRANGEMENT NON-PARTY THOMAS K. S

8/28/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 "TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF THOMAS K. SEYMOUR AND ANY EVIDENCE OF ANY FINANCIAL ARRANGEMENT NON-PARTY THOMAS K. S

Opposition - OPPOSITION BAR BAKERS PARTIES' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATING TO WHETHER A WRITTEN AGREEMENT IS REQUIRED FOR FORMATION OF A JOINT

8/29/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION BAR BAKERS PARTIES' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATING TO WHETHER A WRITTEN AGREEMENT IS REQUIRED FOR FORMATION OF A JOINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO BAR BAKERS' MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO BANK OF AMERICA

9/30/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO BAR BAKERS' MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO BANK OF AMERICA

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND OPINION OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERT LINCOLN DAVIS; DECLARATION OF MANCY PENDERGRASS

10/23/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND OPINION OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERT LINCOLN DAVIS; DECLARATION OF MANCY PENDERGRASS

Request for Dismissal

2/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Jury Question - JURY QUESTION NO. 4

3/12/2020: Jury Question - JURY QUESTION NO. 4

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF LODGING [PROPOSED) JUDGMENT BY BAR BAKERS, LLC

3/30/2020: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF LODGING [PROPOSED) JUDGMENT BY BAR BAKERS, LLC

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NOTICE OF HEARINGS ON MOTIONS FOR NEW TRIAL AND MOTIONS FOR J...) OF 05/20/2020

5/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NOTICE OF HEARINGS ON MOTIONS FOR NEW TRIAL AND MOTIONS FOR J...) OF 05/20/2020

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BAR BAKERS, LLCS MOTION TO TAX COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

7/13/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BAR BAKERS, LLCS MOTION TO TAX COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

FANTASY COOKIE'S OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY REFEREE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE RFPS FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS; ETC.

4/2/2018: FANTASY COOKIE'S OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY REFEREE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE RFPS FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS; ETC.

BAR BAKERS PARLIES' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/17/2018: BAR BAKERS PARLIES' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

11/1/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

Objection - Objection Plaintiffs And Cross-Defendants 1. Objection And Request To Strike The Bar Bakers Parties Consolidated Response To The Fantasy Cookie/FocalPoint Parties Objection To The Discover

1/28/2019: Objection - Objection Plaintiffs And Cross-Defendants 1. Objection And Request To Strike The Bar Bakers Parties Consolidated Response To The Fantasy Cookie/FocalPoint Parties Objection To The Discover

DEFENDANTS BAR BAKERS, IJLC, HAROLD ROTI{MAN, WILLIAM ROSS, AND GARY M. JACOBS? NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

8/7/2015: DEFENDANTS BAR BAKERS, IJLC, HAROLD ROTI{MAN, WILLIAM ROSS, AND GARY M. JACOBS? NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order -

10/15/2015: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS- DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF EXI?ARTE APPLICATION AND EX/?ARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON SPECIAL APPEARANCE MOTION OF DEFENDANT RSR CONSULTING, LLC TO QUASH SERVICE

11/16/2015: PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS- DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF EXI?ARTE APPLICATION AND EX/?ARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON SPECIAL APPEARANCE MOTION OF DEFENDANT RSR CONSULTING, LLC TO QUASH SERVICE

PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS- DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF DAVID E. MARK IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/3/2017: PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS- DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF DAVID E. MARK IN SUPPORT THEREOF

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

12/15/2017: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

733 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Bar Bakers, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Harold Rothman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Harold Rothman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL); Filed by William Ross (Defendant); Harold Rothman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 16, J. Stephen Czuleger, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (/ Amended Memorandum of Costs due from Plaintiff and Defendant Ross)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Fantasy Cookie Corporation (Plaintiff); Joseph Semder (Plaintiff); Richard Semder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by William Ross (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by William Ross (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Fantasy Cookie Corporation (Plaintiff); Joseph Semder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Fantasy Cookie Corporation (Plaintiff); Joseph Semder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,273 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Fantasy Cookie Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC578882    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: 19

NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: Non-Appearance Case Review Re Long Cause Trial Determination

The Court, after reviewing the submitted Long-Cause Trial binders, makes the following ruling:

While the parties successfully addressed nearly all of the many issues identified in the court’s October 22, 2019 order, they failed to address and correct all of the issues.

The court addresses the remaining issues below.

1. Department 1’s prior order noted the court construed the use of “P/D” in the “Offered by” column to indicate joint exhibits and the parties were directed to stipulate to the authenticity of all joint documents. However, the parties failed to stipulate to the authenticity of Exhibit Nos. 80, 81, 90, 91, 154, 242, 252, and 345A.

2. Column D for Exhibit 440 states “NY” rather than either Y or N.

3. Department 1’s prior order noted the exhibits should be renumbered because the parties should not “reserve” exhibits between offered exhibits. However, defendants designated exhibits 1336 through 1501, totaling nearly eight pages, as “Reserved.”

For these reasons, the request to deem the matter as a Long Cause matter is DENIED without prejudice.

The Long Cause Binders are returned to Department 19 forthwith for counsel to collect and make the necessary changes.

Clerk shall give notice.

Certificate of Mailing is attached.

Case Number: BC578882    Hearing Date: October 29, 2019    Dept: 19

The Long Cause Trial Determination is denied without prejudice. The following items are ordered corrected:

Joint Statement of the Case:

Joint Witness List:

Joint Exhibit List:

* Corrected trial brief by Bar Bakers (15 pages in length) has been received by Dept. 19 .

The parties are ordered to make all of the above corrections and submit the revised items to Dept. 19 by 1:30 p.m. on October 23, 2019.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIND, INC. doing business as KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE is a litigant

Latest cases where Bar Bakers, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FANTASY COOKIE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BORDER KERI