This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:36:10 (UTC).

FALLON SEABORN VS SAFEWAY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 FALLON SEABORN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SAFEWAY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0562

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SEABORN FALLON

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 5

COCA-COLA COMPANY THE

SAFEWAY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TRAYLOR MICHAEL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/9/2016: Unknown

CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/9/2016: CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

Minute Order

4/26/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/11/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

5/10/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS

11/9/2016: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Fallon Seaborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less