This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2020 at 09:53:08 (UTC).

FABULOUS J DARLEY ET AL VS JAMES WHITE ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/10/2010 FABULOUS J DARLEY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAMES WHITE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL, MICHELLE R. ROSENBLATT, SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and ROBERT H. O'BRIEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7365

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

MICHELLE R. ROSENBLATT

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DARLEY FABULOUS J.

DARLEY LETICIA C.

Defendants and Respondents

CABRERA MICKEY

CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY

CAMINO REAL MORTGAGE BROKER

CAPITAL TRUST (DOE 11)

DEL SUR CORPORATION

DIAMOND PROPERTIES LLC

DIAMOND PROPERTY INVESTMENTS L.L.C.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.

PACIFIC HOLDINGS LLC

SUGOI PARTNERS LLC (DOE 10)

WHITE JAMES

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAMBIRTH TIMOTHY A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BACON THEODORE E. ESQ.

COLLIGAN BRIAN M. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Court Order - Court makes order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketOrder (GRANTING TITLE BY QUITCLAIM DEED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Granted in Part

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketEx-parte Request for Order (EX-PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR ORDER GRANTING TITLE TO PLAIN- TIFFS PURSUANT TO JUDGMENT ENTERED AND RECORDED ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment (RETURNED TO ATTY SVC ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment ((4)abstracts a.s ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment (4 ABSTRACTS REJECTED: COMPLETE #12 RETURNED TO ATTY SVVC ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Jury Trial - Hearing prev advanced & vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
146 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 40, Michelle R. Rosenblatt, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • DocketDeclaration ( re telephonic notice re ex parte ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • DocketEx-Parte Application (for TRO and OSC re preliminary injunction... ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2010
  • DocketOpposition Document (TO EXPARTE ); Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIAMOND PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases where DEL SUR CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Holdings Partnership is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL TRUST is a litigant