This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 13:49:29 (UTC).

EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. VS. LOVE FREIGHTWAYS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOVE FREIGHTWAYS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, TORRIBIO, JOHN A., RAUL A. SAHAGUN, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and LORI ANN FOURNIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5860

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

TORRIBIO, JOHN A.

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

LORI ANN FOURNIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE INC.

TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MAKSIMOVIC ANA

LOVRE NEMO

NEMANJA LOVRE AN

LOVE FREIGHTWAYS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP

LOVRE NEMANJA AKA NEMO LOVRE AN INDIVIDUAL

Cross Defendants

GE CAPITAL COMMERCIAL INC.

EVERGREEN COMMERCIAL FINANCE INC.

NAVISTAR CORP

NAVISTAR INC.

NAVISTAR FINANCIAL INC.

NAVISTAR CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HEMAR ROUSSO & HEALD LLP

KHATCHADOURIAN RAFFI

MCKENDRICK ROBERT VANCE

Defendant Attorneys

IKONTE CHIJIOKE OBINNAYA

IWUCHUKU DON

AKUDINOBI EMMANUEL CHUKWUEMEK

HARRINGTON FOXX DUBROW & CANTER LLP

OGIKE METU CHIKEZIE

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/26/2019: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Order - ORDER RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER

3/18/2020: Order - ORDER RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 04/01/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTINUING FUTURE HEARING DATES.) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTINUING FUTURE HEARING DATES.) OF 04/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/15/2020: Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Status Report

9/4/2020: Status Report

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: CROSS-COMPL FLD - SUMMONS ISSUED

12/16/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: CROSS-COMPL FLD - SUMMONS ISSUED

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/17/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Ruling

6/5/2017: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-07-31 00:00:00

7/31/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-07-31 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Deft's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer

7/31/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Deft's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

8/15/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-11-30 00:00:00

11/30/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-11-30 00:00:00

Notice -

8/13/2018: Notice -

Order - Order to Continue Trial Dates

11/15/2018: Order - Order to Continue Trial Dates

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF PLANTIFF'S PMQ AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $2000

3/12/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF PLANTIFF'S PMQ AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $2000

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • Hearing04/06/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Hearing04/06/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (Re: Entry of Judgment); Filed by TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Re Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Plaintiff); TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (as to defendant/cross complainant Love Freightways) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
179 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 10/19/16 Proof of Service by Mail attached ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Plaintiff); TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC065860    Hearing Date: March 12, 2020    Dept: SEC

EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. v. LOVE FREIGHTWAYS, INC.

CASE NO.: VC065860

HEARING: 03/12/2020

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

#6

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC.’s motion for summary judgment or alternatively summary adjudication is GRANTED. CCP § 437c.

Moving Party to give Notice.

No Opposition has been filed as of March 10, 2020. The Court notes, however, that it has received and considered Defendant’s “Response to Plaintiff’s Separate Statement” and the Declaration of Nemanja Lovre in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff’s Motion for Summary Judgment.

This action for breach of contract was filed by Plaintiff on October 12, 2016. In its Complaint, Plaintiff alleges, in pertinent part, “On or about October 18, 2013, Defendant LOVE FREIGHTWAYS, INC….entered into a written Loan and Security Agreement (hereinafter the ‘Agreement’) with Plaintiff’s predecessor in interest, GE CAPITAL COMMERCIAL, INC. to finance the purchase of three (3) 2012 International Prostar Tractor Trucks.” (Complaint ¶8.) “On or about June 12, 2014, GE CAPITAL COMMERCIAL, INC. sold and assigned all of its rights, title and interest in the Agreement and the Trucks to Plaintiff….” (Complaint ¶11.) “On or about January 10, 2016, and continuing thereafter, Defendants breached the terms of the Agreement by failing to make the monthly payment then due and owing. In addition, Defendants failed and refused and continue to fail and refuse to make any further payments coming due thereunder. [¶] Plaintiff subsequently recovered the Truck with VIN ending in 5296 and sold it in a commercially reasonable manner and recovered net proceeds in the amount of $9,722.50, which ahs been credited to the amounts owing herein. Plaintiff is informed and believes, and thereon alleges, that the Trucks with VIN ending in 5303 and 5330 were subsequently sold at a Mechanic’s Lien Sale, without Plaintiff’s consent or knowledge, and through no fault of Plaintiff, thus rendering said collateral of Plaintiff’s worthless. [¶] Pursuant to the terms of the Agreement, upon Defendants’ default, Plaintiff elected to accelerate the balance due thereunder…. [¶] No party of said sum has been made….” (Complaint ¶¶ 13-16.)

Plaintiff’s Complaint asserts the following causes of action: (1) Breach of Written Agreement; (2) Account Stated; (3) Unjust Enrichment (4) Open Book Account; and (5) Breach of Guaranty.

Although not articulated in a substantive Opposition Brief, it appears as though Defendant is arguing that there can be no breach of contract because the trucks were defective—therefore, Plaintiff/Plaintiff’s assignor has failed to fully perform under the Agreement, and Defendant should owe Plaintiff nothing.

Defendant’s argument lacks merit. As argued in Reply, page one of the Loan and Security Agreement states, in all upper-case print: “LENDER MAKES NO REPRESENTATIONS OR WARRANTIES, EXPRESS OR IMPLIED, AS TO THE QUALITY, WORKMANSHIP, DESIGN, MERCHANTABILITY, SUITABILITY, OR FITNESS OF THE EQUIPMENT FOR ANY PARTICULAR PURPOSE, OR ANY OTHER REPRESENTATION OR WARRANTY WHATSOEVER, EXPRESS O IMPLIED.” (McGovern Decl., Ex. 1.)

The following facts are undisputed: Plaintiff’s assignor and Defendant entered into the Loan and Security Agreement for the purchase of three trucks; the Loan and Security Agreement was assigned to Plaintiff; Defendant received and accepted the three trucks; and Defendant made monthly payments until the time of default.

The Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVERBANK COMMERCIAL FINANCE INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS TYGRIS VENDOR FINANCE INC FORMERLY KNOWN AS US EXPRESS LEASING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Navistar, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IKONTE CHIJIOKE OBINNAYA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OGIKE METU C.