This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2019 at 22:22:00 (UTC).

EVERARDO VEGA ET AL VS AGILEX FLAVORS AND FRAGRANCES INC

Case Summary

On 11/14/2014 EVERARDO VEGA filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against AGILEX FLAVORS AND FRAGRANCES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA M. SCHEPER, ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3822

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VEGA EVERARDO

VEGA LETICIA

Defendants

AGILEX FLAVORS AND FRAGRANCES INC.

ASHLAND INC.

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC.

CALUMET SPECIALTY PRODUCTS PARTNERS LP

CHEMCOR CHEMICAL CORP.

CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING COMPANY

COGNIS CORPORATION

CHEMICAL CORPORATION OF AMERICA

CHEMTECH CHEMICAL COMPANY

COGNIS USA LLC.

EXXONMOBILOIL CORPORATION

INTAROME FRANGRANCE CORPORATION

KEYSTONE ANILINE CORPORATION

NEXEO SOLUTIONS LLC

NORMAN FOX & CO.

ROHM AND HAAS CHEMICALS LLC

SHELL OIL COMPANY

SONNEBORN LLC

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

METZER LAW GROUP APLC

METZGER LAW GROUP APLC

Defendant Attorneys

BAKER & MCKENZIE LAW OFFICES OF

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

VANDENBURG THOMAS F.

YANG REY S. ESQ.

MILAM JEFFREY L. LAW OFFICE OF

COHEN-KATZ DEIDRE F. ESQ.

PETERSON KENNETH A.

KAIMAN BARRY G. ESQ.

KELTS ANNE M.

LEVINE JOSHUA N.

BARNES & THORNBURG LLP

BASSI EDLIN HUIE BLUM LLP

KING & SPALDING LLP

POOLE & SHAFFERY LLP

SEDGWICK LLP

STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

WALSWORTH FRANKLIN BEVINS & MCCALL

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT

11/14/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT

SUMMONS

11/14/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT ASSERTING FOR TOXIC INJURIES CAUSES OF ACTION FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

11/14/2014: COMPLAINT ASSERTING FOR TOXIC INJURIES CAUSES OF ACTION FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

11/14/2014: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEFENDANT NORMAN, FOX & CO.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

12/30/2014: DEFENDANT NORMAN, FOX & CO.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/29/2015: NOTICE OF RULING OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/29/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION OF THE HONORABLE BARBARA SCHEPER

5/5/2015: PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION OF THE HONORABLE BARBARA SCHEPER

REQUEST FOR REFUND OF COMPLEX FEES

5/6/2015: REQUEST FOR REFUND OF COMPLEX FEES

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING NON -COMPLEX DETERMINATION

5/6/2015: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING NON -COMPLEX DETERMINATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER DATED APRIL 29, 2015, RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/8/2015: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER DATED APRIL 29, 2015, RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

5/11/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/14/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

5/14/2015: Unknown

NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

5/14/2015: NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL AND WRONGFUL DEATH FROM TOXIC INJURIES ASSERTING CAUSES OF ACTION FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

5/18/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL AND WRONGFUL DEATH FROM TOXIC INJURIES ASSERTING CAUSES OF ACTION FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST AND LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER

5/18/2015: STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST AND LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER

Minute Order

5/19/2015: Minute Order

280 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY PDISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Everardo Vega (Plaintiff); Leticia Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Everardo Vega (Plaintiff); Leticia Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Everardo Vega (Plaintiff); Leticia Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 48; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD FEBRUARY 1, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Everardo Vega (Plaintiff); Leticia Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
647 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Everardo Vega (Plaintiff); Leticia Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Everardo Vega (Plaintiff); Leticia Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Everardo Vega (Plaintiff); Leticia Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Everardo Vega (Plaintiff); Leticia Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by Everardo Vega (Plaintiff); Leticia Vega (Plaintiff); Jonathan Vega (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Notice; Filed by Everardo Vega (Plaintiff); Leticia Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • COMPLAINT ASSERTING FOR TOXIC INJURIES CAUSES OF ACTION FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COGNIS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NORMAN FOX & CO. is a litigant