This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 16:07:33 (UTC).

EVELIA RODRIGUEZ, ET. AL VS. 21ST CENTURY MANAGEMENT, ET. AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2013 EVELIA RODRIGUEZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 21ST CENTURY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7392

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARIAS GERARDO

RODRIGUEZ EVELIA

Defendants

21ST CENTURY MANAGEMENT INC.

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL

BEST CO INVESTMENTS A BUSINESS ENTITY

BLACKWELL MARINA

BRITE MIND SERVICES A BUSINESS ENTITY

CAL TEAM SERVICES A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

CARLSON CECILIA

COAST 2 COAST A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

EXCEL GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

EXION ENTERPRISE A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE A BUSINESS

FIRST SOLUTION A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

GRAND SLAM VENTURES A BUSINESS ENTITY

INOVESTE POINTE A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

MACIAS LUIS MIGUEL

MICHAEL MARTINEZ TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD

NEXUS POINTE A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

OPTION FINANCIAL A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF ANTONIO GALLO AND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2014
  • Default Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Notice (OF REJECTION OF REQ FOR COURT JUDGMT ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • Default Entered (*UPDATED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Default Entered Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REJECTION OF 25 DEFAULTS- ITEM 1(B) ONLY HAS ONE PLAINTIFF WHAT HAPPENED TO GERARDO ARIAS? ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (rejection of requests for default All defts. item 1a-wrong date of fAC filing & decl. on non mailing must have name of deft. being defaulted ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • Proof of Publication Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Proof of Publication Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Order (ORDER FOR PUBLICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REJECTION OF PROOFS OF SERVICE AS TO LAURA CECILIA CARLSON- NAME DOES NOT MATCH AMENDED COMP. ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR OSC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • Summons Filed (ON FAC ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.