This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2023 at 05:51:30 (UTC).

EVE EDELMAN VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2016 EVE EDELMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6875

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDELMAN EVE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

11906 SAN VICENTE LLC SETTLED

WICKNAM MARY C. ESQ.

ALFRED STREET COFFEE COMPANY SETTLED

DRUCKER MICHAEL S.

BANSKOTA NIRMAL M.D. INC.

AKHTARZAD MICHAEL

Defendant and Cross Defendant

11906 SAN VICENTE LLC SETTLED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CONLOGUE KEVIN SHAWN ESQ

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON ERIC G.

COCHRAN BRUCE W. PRINCIPAL DEPUTY COUN

Other Attorneys

LEWIS HONEY A

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE)

1/27/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE)

Legacy Document -

2/15/2017: Legacy Document -

Legacy Document -

2/15/2017: Legacy Document -

Legacy Document -

2/15/2017: Legacy Document -

Notice - of Disassociation of Counsel

2/9/2018: Notice - of Disassociation of Counsel

Association of Attorney -

2/9/2018: Association of Attorney -

[ ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

2/26/2018: [ ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FSC DATES

3/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FSC DATES

NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

4/3/2018: NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

5/10/2018: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PLAINTIFF AND SAN VICENTE COFFEE COMPANY DBA ALFRED COFFEE BRENTWOOD (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALFRED STREET COFFEE COMPANY) AND 11906 SAN VI

7/27/2018: EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PLAINTIFF AND SAN VICENTE COFFEE COMPANY DBA ALFRED COFFEE BRENTWOOD (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALFRED STREET COFFEE COMPANY) AND 11906 SAN VI

MINUTE ORDER

7/27/2018: MINUTE ORDER

ORDER FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PLAINTIFF AND SAN VICENTE COFFEE COMPANY DBA ALFRED COFFEE BRENTWOOD (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALFRED STREET COFFEE COMPANY) AND 11906 SAN VICENTE, LLC

7/27/2018: ORDER FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PLAINTIFF AND SAN VICENTE COFFEE COMPANY DBA ALFRED COFFEE BRENTWOOD (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALFRED STREET COFFEE COMPANY) AND 11906 SAN VICENTE, LLC

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

7/30/2018: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

7/30/2018: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF EVE EDELMAN'S REQUEST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY CITY EMPLOYEE TOM WONG AT TRIAL AND EXHIBIT A

7/31/2018: DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF EVE EDELMAN'S REQUEST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY CITY EMPLOYEE TOM WONG AT TRIAL AND EXHIBIT A

NOTICE OF RULING RE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

8/1/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order -

8/3/2018: Minute Order -

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by EVE EDELMAN on 07/13/2016, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement;) of 12/27/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Alexander Joshua Zeesman (Attorney): First Name changed from APC to Alexander; Last Name changed from Accident Fighters to Zeesman; Organization Name: Accident Fighters, APC; Middle Name: Joshua

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketAddress for Alexander Joshua Zeesman (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Alexander Joshua Zeesman (Attorney): Organization Name: Accident Fighters, APC; Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name changed from J. to Joshua

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketAddress for Alexander Joshua Zeesman (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement scheduled for 12/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4 updated: Result Date to 12/27/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Eve Edelman (Plaintiff); As to: Alfred Street Coffee Company (settled) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by EVE EDELMAN on 07/13/2016, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Eve Edelman as to Alfred Street Coffee Company (settled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketDocument:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 07/15/19 at 8:30 am Randolph M. Hammock

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less