Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 17:54:31 (UTC).

EVAN C ITZKOWITZ VS LEVIN & MARGOLIN ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/01/2013 EVAN C ITZKOWITZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LEVIN MARGOLIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and ABRAHAM KHAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7604

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

ABRAHAM KHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ITZKOWITZ EVAN C.

Defendants and Respondents

LEVIN & MARGOLIN

LEVIN LIONEL

MARGOLIN ELYSE

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF KIRSTEN MILLER

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ERIC A. PANITZ

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

5/1/2013: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/3/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/20/2013: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/21/2013: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/21/2013: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER THEREON

8/21/2013: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER THEREON

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/2/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/7/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF POSTING ADVANC JURY FEES

10/8/2013: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF POSTING ADVANC JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

10/8/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

10/21/2013: Minute Order -

DEFENDANTS LEVIN & MARGOLIN, LIONEL LEVIN, ELYSE MARGOLIN `S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF EVAN C. ITZKOWITZ?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

11/7/2013: DEFENDANTS LEVIN & MARGOLIN, LIONEL LEVIN, ELYSE MARGOLIN `S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF EVAN C. ITZKOWITZ?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

12/19/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/3/2014: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

2/27/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

NOTICE OF SETIL-EMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/21/2014: NOTICE OF SETIL-EMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/30/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

6/13/2014: Minute Order -

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 51, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 51, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Overruled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • DocketReply/Response; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVIN & MARGOLIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANITZ ERIC A.