This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2021 at 00:45:19 (UTC).

EVA MORA VS FIVE DS APPAREL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2012 EVA MORA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FIVE DS APPAREL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL JOHNSON and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8192

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL JOHNSON

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MORA EVA

Defendants and Respondents

C3 & M2 INC.

FIVE D'S APPAREL INC.

RIOS CARLOS

D&D SEWING COMPANY INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Assignee and Not Classified By Court

UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC

Other

TORRES DENNIS

Not Classified By Court

CHERMISQUI ROSANA

UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

VASQUEZ OLIVER J. ESQ.

Assignee Attorney

YEARGIN COLE WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

FIRST AMEN1WI) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGFS, ETC

12/21/2012: FIRST AMEN1WI) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGFS, ETC

Proof of Service -

5/19/2014: Proof of Service -

CIVIL DEPOSIT

10/17/2012: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

10/19/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/22/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DECLARATION OF RAMIN R. YOUNESSI, ESQ. RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/25/2012: DECLARATION OF RAMIN R. YOUNESSI, ESQ. RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS C3 & M2, INC. AND CARLOS RIOS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF EVA MORA'S COMPLAINT

12/19/2012: PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS C3 & M2, INC. AND CARLOS RIOS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF EVA MORA'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF EVA MORA?S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDANT CARLOS RIOS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, ATTORNEYS? FEES AND COSTS; DECLARTION OF HIL

6/27/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF EVA MORA?S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDANT CARLOS RIOS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, ATTORNEYS? FEES AND COSTS; DECLARTION OF HIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF EVA MORA?S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDAT C3 & M2 INC.; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, ATTORNEYS? FEES AND COSTS; DECLARTION OF HIL

6/27/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF EVA MORA?S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDAT C3 & M2 INC.; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, ATTORNEYS? FEES AND COSTS; DECLARTION OF HIL

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED DISCOVERY RESPONSES

6/27/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED DISCOVERY RESPONSES

NOTICE OF TAKING ALL FOUR (4) MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MORA?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO AND COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY REQUESTS OFF CALENDAR

8/5/2013: NOTICE OF TAKING ALL FOUR (4) MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MORA?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO AND COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY REQUESTS OFF CALENDAR

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

4/21/2014: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

NOTICE OF RULING OF MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

5/19/2014: NOTICE OF RULING OF MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

5/19/2014: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

Minute Order -

6/16/2014: Minute Order -

JUDGMENT

9/25/2014: JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

9/25/2014: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

AMENDED JUDGMENT

3/27/2015: AMENDED JUDGMENT

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • Hearing01/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Order to Issue Consumer Credit Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (to Issue Consumer Credit Report; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Cole W. Yeargin); Filed by Upstream Capital Investments, LLC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Eva Mora (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Eva Mora (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by Eva Mora (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Eva Mora (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
173 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMEF CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2012-01-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC488192    Hearing Date: January 29, 2021    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

EVA MORA, etc.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

FIVE D’S APPAREL, INC., etc., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: BC488192

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ORDER TO ISSUE CONSUMER CREDIT REPORT

Date: January 29, 2021

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept. 56

MOVING PARTY: Judgment Creditor and Assignee of Record, Upstream Capital Investments, LLC (“UCI”)

The Court has considered the moving papers. No opposition papers were filed.

BACKGROUND

UCI filed an unopposed motion (the “Motion”) under Code Civ. Proc. § 1785.11 for an order directing any one or more credit reporting agency to issue a consumer credit report to be used towards enforcement and satisfaction of the Amended Judgment entered against judgment debtor Carlos Rios (“Rios”). The Amended Judgment was entered against Rios on March 27, 2015.

Due to the lack of opposition, the Motion is GRANTED. (Sexton v. Superior Court (1997) 58 Cal.App.4th 1403, 1410.)

Moving party is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

In consideration of the current COVID-19 pandemic situation, the Court strongly encourages that appearances on all proceedings, including this one, be made by LACourtConnect if the parties do not submit on the tentative.  If you instead intend to make an appearance in person at Court on this matter, you must send an email by 2 p.m. on the last Court day before the scheduled date of the hearing to SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

Dated this 29th day of January 2021

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D&D SEWING COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIVE D'S APPAREL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant