Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 13:14:50 (UTC).

EVA J. YESIA VS. KAFCO PARTNERSHIP,; ET AL,

Case Summary

On 12/09/2011 EVA J YESIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KAFCO PARTNERSHIP, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY KEOSIAN, WILLIAM G. WILLETT, LAURA C. ELLISON, ELIA WEINBACH and RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6088

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY KEOSIAN

WILLIAM G. WILLETT

LAURA C. ELLISON

ELIA WEINBACH

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YESIA EVA J.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CAIN CHRIS

DOES 1 TO 20

KAFCO PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED P

MARKARIAN GARO

ROFF ENTERPRISES INC.

SOUTHER CALIFORNIA PIZZA DOE 1

D.R. INC. DBA ROFF ENTERPRISES

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Others

BOYLE EMILY R.

DUNBAR DANIEL W.

Not Classified By Court

SHERMAN JEROLD S. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAIGNEAULT PHILIP

DUNBAR DANIEL W.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HATEM ROBERT J.

STAYTON N. LAURIE

KLINEDINST PC

GREEN & HALL

LEVY CHERYL A.

JOHNSON JERRI L.

PC KLINEDINST

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS I INCORRECT NAME)

4/19/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS I INCORRECT NAME)

SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

6/13/2013: SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

6/14/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/25/2013: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED TRIAL DATES; ORDER

7/22/2013: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED TRIAL DATES; ORDER

NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES

7/25/2013: NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

10/15/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

12/19/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PIZZA COMPANY, LLC?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES; DECLARATION OF PHILIP J. AZZARA IN SUPPORT THEREOF

12/31/2013: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PIZZA COMPANY, LLC?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES; DECLARATION OF PHILIP J. AZZARA IN SUPPORT THEREOF

D.R. INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF BUILDING CODE VIOLATION (MIL 2]

1/6/2014: D.R. INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF BUILDING CODE VIOLATION (MIL 2]

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/13/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, EVA J. YESIA,TO DEFENDANT, D.R. INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 ETC.

1/16/2014: OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, EVA J. YESIA,TO DEFENDANT, D.R. INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 ETC.

OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, EVA J. YESIA, TO D.R. INC?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 ETC.

1/16/2014: OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, EVA J. YESIA, TO D.R. INC?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 ETC.

OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, EVA J. YESIA TO MOTION IN LIMINE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PIZZA COMPANY, LLC TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE ETC.

1/16/2014: OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, EVA J. YESIA TO MOTION IN LIMINE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PIZZA COMPANY, LLC TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE ETC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/28/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

2/3/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

2/26/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

2/28/2014: Minute Order -

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; (Osc Re Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by EVA J. YESIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department LA91, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Final Status Conference (JT 3/12/14) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by EVA J. YESIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EVA J. YESIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by EVA J. YESIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference (DATE: 5-18-12 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON JERRI LYNN