This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2021 at 10:13:27 (UTC).

EUN SUG CHA VS PAULO HAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/22/2013 EUN SUG CHA filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against PAULO HAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH R. KALIN, JOHN L. SEGAL, TERESA A. BEAUDET and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5259

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH R. KALIN

JOHN L. SEGAL

TERESA A. BEAUDET

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHA EUN SUG

Porter Ranch, CA 91326

Defendants and Respondents

AHN L

AHN LILY J.

CHOI BOK HWA

CHOI HANK J.

CHOI HYUNG JIN

CHOI HYUNGI

CHOI JA

CHOI KYOO HONG

CNP HOLDINGS

CONTINENTAL LION INC.

DO JONG SOO

E2WEST

GAN AIE KYUNG

HAN HYON S.

HAN IN SUK

HAN INAE

HAN JONG NAM

HAN PAULO

HAN YOUNG HI

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LEE FRANK N. ESQ.

BROWN BAIRD A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEE W. DAN

PARK LAW APC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS) OF 04/16/2020

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

1/3/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

2/2/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/12/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

6/12/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/12/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

7/7/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/7/2014: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

RULING

12/18/2014: RULING

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

12/30/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE- CIVIL

12/30/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE- CIVIL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE--CIVIL

12/30/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE--CIVIL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

12/30/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

DEFENDANTS JONG SOO HAN AND SOO HYUN AHN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

3/14/2016: DEFENDANTS JONG SOO HAN AND SOO HYUN AHN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/17/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

DEFENDANTS JONG SOO HANG AND SOO HYUN AHN (HAN)'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 4

6/15/2017: DEFENDANTS JONG SOO HANG AND SOO HYUN AHN (HAN)'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 4

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

7/28/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

REQUEST FOR INTERPRETER (CIVIL)

8/18/2017: REQUEST FOR INTERPRETER (CIVIL)

340 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketOrder (Motion to Strike or Tax Costs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion - Other TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS) of 08/05/2020, Order re Motion to Strike or Tax Costs); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:42 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
707 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-02-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: FRAUD 1. BREACH OF CONTFACT., 2. FRAUD 3. CONVERSION 4. CONSPIRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eun Sug Cha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC525259    Hearing Date: August 05, 2020    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

eun sug cha,

Plaintiff,

vs.

paulo han, et al.

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 525259

Hearing Date:

August 5, 2020

Hearing Time:

2:00 p.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS

Background

This action was filed on October 22, 2013. On August 2, 2018, following a bench trial, the Court entered judgment in favor of Defendants Jong Soo Han and Soo Hyun Ahn (jointly, “Defendants”). Notice of entry of the judgment was served on August 15, 2018 and a copy filed on August 16, 2018. On August 29, 2019, Defendants filed a Memorandum of Costs, seeking an award of costs in the total amount of $8,279.33

Plaintiff Eun Sug Cha (“Plaintiff”) now moves to strike or tax Defendants’ costs. The motion is unopposed.

Discussion

A prevailing party is entitled to recover costs, including attorneys’ fees, as a matter of right, except as otherwise expressly provided by statute. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 1032(a)(4), 1032(b), 1033.5.) Costs recoverable under section 1032 are restricted to those that are both reasonable in amount and reasonably necessary to the conduct of the litigation. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 1033.5(c)(2), (3).) Costs “merely convenient or beneficial” to the preparation of a case are disallowed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1033.5(c)(2); see Ladas v. California State Auto. Assn. (1993) 19 Cal.App.4th 761, 774 [expenses for attorney meals incurred while attending local depositions not “reasonably necessary”].)

“A ‘verified memorandum of costs is prima facie evidence of [the] propriety’ of the items listed on it, and the burden is on the party challenging these costs to demonstrate that they were not reasonable or necessary.” (Adams v. Ford Motor Co. (2011) 199 Cal.App.4th 1475, 1486-1487 [italics and brackets omitted].) “If the items appearing in a cost bill appear to be proper charges, the burden is on the party seeking to tax costs to show that they were not reasonable or necessary. On the other hand, if the items are properly objected to, they are put in issue and the burden of proof is on the party claiming them as costs.” (Ladas v. California State Auto. Assn., supra, 19 Cal.App.4th at p. 774.) Costs otherwise allowable as a matter of right may be disallowed if the court determines they were not reasonably necessary, and the court has power to reduce the amount of any cost item to an amount that is reasonable. (See Perko’s Enterprises, Inc. v. RRNS Enterprises (1992) 4 Cal.App.4th 238, 245 [finding that “the intent and effect of section 1033.5, subdivision (c)(2) is to authorize a trial court to disallow recovery of costs, including filing fees, when it determines the costs were incurred unnecessarily”].)

Plaintiff contends that Defendants’ memorandum of costs is untimely. “A prevailing party who claims costs must serve and file a memorandum of costs within 15 days after the date of service of the notice of entry of judgment or dismissal by the clerk . . . or the date of service of written notice of entry of judgment or dismissal, or within 180 days after entry of judgment, whichever is first. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1700(a).) Here, notice of entry of judgment was served on August 15, 2018. Thus, Defendants’ memorandum of costs, filed on August 29, 2019, is untimely.

Conclusion

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff’s motion to strike Defendants’ memorandum of costs filed August 29, 2019 is granted.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

DATED: August 5, 2020

________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE W. DAN