This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2021 at 05:12:45 (UTC).

EULALIA SALGADO VS FERNANDO CAUICH

Case Summary

On 11/26/2013 EULALIA SALGADO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FERNANDO CAUICH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8835

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SALGADO EULALIA

Defendants and Respondents

CAUICH FERNANDO

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

ROES 1 - 10

WATTS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION

SINHA SANTOSH M.D.

Other

DEWITT ALGORRI & ALGORRI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PALUMBO BRUCE ESQ.

DEWITT ALGORRI & ALGORRI

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FUCHS JOHN PAUL

MCKENNA ROBERT L. III. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

11/26/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE; NEGLIGENCE PER SE)

11/26/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE; NEGLIGENCE PER SE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/3/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/14/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE; NEGLIGENCE PER SE)

1/16/2014: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE; NEGLIGENCE PER SE)

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/16/2014: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/1/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/1/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/30/2014: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/21/2014: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

6/4/2014: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

10/24/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

5/8/2015: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

5/12/2015: Minute Order -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

5/15/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

12/1/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (OSC RE Dismissal; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eulalia Salgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Trial; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Eulalia Salgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Eulalia Salgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE; NEGLIGENCE PER SE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Fernando Cauich (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Eulalia Salgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eulalia Salgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE; NEGLIGENCE PER SE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEWITT ALGORRI & ALGORRI PC is a litigant

Latest cases where WATTS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FUCHS JOHN PAUL ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKENNA ROBERT LOWELL III ESQ.