This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2016 at 08:43:45 (UTC).

ESTRELLITA DIAZ VS CITY OF AZUSA

Case Summary

On 03/28/2012 ESTRELLITA DIAZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF AZUSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MEEKA, PETER J., SIRNA, SALVATORE T., SAMANTHA P. JESSNER, MINTO, R. BRUCE, DUKES, ROBERT A. and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3466

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEEKA, PETER J.

SIRNA, SALVATORE T.

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

MINTO, R. BRUCE

DUKES, ROBERT A.

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AZUSA CITY OF

AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

HERNANDEZ MARIA

AZUSA CITY OF (DEM SUS W/O LEAVE)

AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (DEMURRER)

Cross Defendant and Defendant

AZUSA CITY OF (DEM SUS W/O LEAVE)

Minor

DIAZ ESTRELLITA

Guardian Ad Litem

VALERIO CATALINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CUNNINGHAM MARK G.

MCCUNE DANA JOHN ESQ.

PISANO CHRISTOPHER M.

Minor Attorneys

KRAMER R. BRIAN

RICHEDA ESTELA LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT 93 OF THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

4/19/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT 93 OF THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

4/19/2013: NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

4/19/2013: NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

4/19/2013: NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

4/19/2013: NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SECTION 1987]

CITY OF AZUSA?S RFSPONSF ANI) OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF?S PROPOSFI) ORI)FR DENYING THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER COURT ORDER

7/19/2013: CITY OF AZUSA?S RFSPONSF ANI) OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF?S PROPOSFI) ORI)FR DENYING THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER COURT ORDER

CITY OF AZUSA?S OB.JIXTION TO PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO CITY?S RFSPONSF AND OBJECTIONS

7/23/2013: CITY OF AZUSA?S OB.JIXTION TO PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO CITY?S RFSPONSF AND OBJECTIONS

PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO CITY OF AZUSA?S RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF?S PROPOSED ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF AZUSA

7/23/2013: PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO CITY OF AZUSA?S RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF?S PROPOSED ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF AZUSA

Minute Order

9/25/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/13/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR?S CLAIM

2/18/2014: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR?S CLAIM

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION, ETC

2/20/2014: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION, ETC

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF R. BRIAN KRAMER IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY?S FEES AND COSTS [CAL. RULE 7.955]

2/21/2014: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF R. BRIAN KRAMER IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY?S FEES AND COSTS [CAL. RULE 7.955]

Minute Order

3/14/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING DOCUMENT TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL [CRC 2.551(A)]

3/19/2014: NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING DOCUMENT TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL [CRC 2.551(A)]

NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF?S PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY?S FEES AND COSTS

3/19/2014: NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF?S PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY?S FEES AND COSTS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/29/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/6/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2015
  • Order (re withdrawal of funds from blocked account ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Petition (for withdrawal of funds from blocked account ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Notice (TO APPEAR AT TRIAL IN IEU OF SUBPOENA [C.C.P. SEC.1987; WITNESS: CARL E. HASSEL; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (cross-complaint against City of Azusa and Azusa Unified School District ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF AZUSA ON OCTOBER 3, 2012 CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON OCTOBER 3, 2013 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Receipt-Deposit Funds-Blocked Acct Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • Notice of Ruling (and Notice of OSC RE Dismissal & Proof of Deposit into Blocked Account ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Notice of Ruling ( RE: Motion for Order Allowing Document to be Filed Under Seal [CRC 2.551(a)] ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Notice of Ruling (RE: Petition for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor and Award of Attorney's Fees & Costs ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2012
  • Notice (of case reassignment ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Notice (Of Unavailability of Counsel ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • Demurrer (AUSD ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer (SET 6/14/12 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Association of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (CITY OF AZUSA MARIA HERNANDEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where AZUSA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCUNE DANA JOHN ESQ